This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 06:56:34 (UTC).

Notley et al v. Marriott International Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Notley filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Marriott International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are George Jarrod Hazel and Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-03776

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

George Jarrod Hazel

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clarice Notley

Derrick Palmer

Ethan Schaffer

Zhaochuan Wang

Alaa Shaaban

Eric Cooper

Defendant

Marriott International Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce M Plaxen

Attorney at Plaxen and Adler PA

10211 Wincopin Circle, Suite 620

Columbia, MD 21044

David A Muncy

Attorney at Plaxen and Adler PA

10211 Wincopin Circle Ste 620

Columbia, MD 21044

Jeremy Robinson

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield

110 Laurel St.

San Diego, CA 92101

Gayle Blatt

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield

110 Laurel St.

San Diego, CA 92101

Gayle M Blatt

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield

110 Laurel St.

San Diego, CA 92101

Patricia Guerra

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield LLP

110 Laurel St.

San Diego, CA 92101

Patricia Camille Guerra

Attorney at Casey Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt and Penfield LLP

110 Laurel St.

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R Warren

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

Lisa M Ghannoum

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

Gilbert S Keteltas

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw Ste. 1100

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#791

(#54) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun YurtkuranAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#58

(#53) LETTER ORDER adopting with modifications (704) Report and Recommendations of Special Master regarding paragraph 11 and Protective Order against subpoenas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#58

(#52) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#654

(#51) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

40 #5

Verification

40 #4

Verification

40 #3

Exhibit

40 #2

Exhibit

40 #1

Exhibit

40 #624

(#50) (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#8

(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa M Ghannoum. Directing attorney Lisa M Ghannoum to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#7

(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel R Warren. Directing attorney Daniel R Warren to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Eric Cooper, Clarice Notley, Derrick Palmer, Ethan Schaffer, Alaa Shaaban, Zhaochuan Wang re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Plaxen, Bruce) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#1

(#3) NOTICE by Eric Cooper, Clarice Notley, Derrick Palmer, Ethan Schaffer, Alaa Shaaban, Zhaochuan Wang re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Plaxen, Bruce) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Arnold, Edward Baker, Brad Barringer, Kiana Belcher, Kevin Berry, Susan Beverley, Douglas Blake, Michael Blicher, Carol Blood, Robert Bluestone, Tanesha Boradgiak, Michael Bunker, Brenda Burr, Yvette Butler, Shelia Canipe, Deana Cannon, Catherine Carlberg, Ruthanne Carpenter, Cheryl Castor, Michael Castor, Crystal Chambers, Kathleen Christensen, Prudence Concert-White, Curtis Cummings, Mary Ellen Davey, Christopher Davies, Dorothy Davis, Karen Davis, Kenneth Davis, Graves De Armond, Cynthia Deese, May Desrochers, Scott Dias, Sami Difuntorum, Jonathan Dodart, Julie Duchsherer, Mark Duffey, Gretchen Ehle, Vance Edward Eichelberger, Carla Engle, Barbara Erickson, Michelle Featherstone, Ronald Michael Feschak, Nathan Finney, Janice Frazier-Scott, Lisa Frederickson, Michael Freeland, Lisa Fritz, Marlon Gaines, Steve Gajewski, Laurene Gallway, Eric Gault, Betsy Gentry, Scott Gideon, John Gilliland, Jon Goldberg, Angela Gresh, Latausha Griffin, Jernard Griggs, Edward Hanley, Charles Hanson, Sheila Harrison, Danielle Hayes, Phyllis Hecker, Amber Helton, Jeri Holt-Minter, Virginia Howell, Donna Hughes, Patricia Huizar, Tamika Jackson, Kyle Jaski, Monica Johnson, Nikole Jordan, Mary Jo Jurey, Robert Kaiser, Lucy Karl, Jeffrey Kemp, Linda Kite, Joan Knudson, Sarah Korwan, Ronald Kotz, Ellen Kowitt, Maretta Leitka, Rik Lewis, Beverly Louk, Anthony Malfi, Patrice Matthews, Olivia May, Susan Mcintosh, David Melendez, Holger Meyer, Debra Michaud, Jack Milam, Judy Mills, Chalise Morris, Chris Morris, David Moyer, Susan Mullins, Dorothy Odie, Jeffrey Oelhafen, Christina Olsen, Carol Ostapchuk, Steven Owens, Asim Padh, Justin Palmer, Darrel Parris, Janlisa Parris, Curtis Payne, Lawrence Perlmutter, Jeninne Pitts, Christopher Pratt, Burnease Ragin, Jeffrey Rahn, Michael Raimondi, Karen Rambat, Michael Rapp, Kumar Rashad, Beverly Ricks, Selma Rodriguez, Ruth Patricia Rosados, Andrew Rose, Joel Rosson, Mark Rotondi, Deidrinelle Rouse, Karen Russell, Rick Sabath, Bruce Sanders, Anne Santo, Anne Savarese, Vincent Savarese, Sonja Scott, David Secrist, Shawn Seeley, Tonekia Showell, Tamika Simmonds, John Simmons, Edward Siperstein, Lee Slagle, Dale Smith, Shane Somerville, Angela Sonnier, David Sparks, Kent Spence, Jody Stephens, Rhonda Stevens, Theresa Sykes, Debra Talley, Peter Tapling, Joe Taylor, Gordon Thomas, Joseph Throneberry, Beverly Tookey, Ricardo Vaquer, Edgar Vaynshteyn, Vickie Vetter, Felicia Wallace, John Waller, Kevin Walls, Jean Waskiewicz, Curtis Weaver, Ira Weintraub, Janet Wender, Marjorie Wheeler, Doreen Whelan, Debra Whiddon, Melissa White, Charles Williams, Gerald Williams, Linda Winsey, Stacey Wollman, Dennis Wooldridge, Maria Wooten, Ronzella Wright-Loftly, Jason Young, Julie Young, Melissa Yurkanin, Shaun YurtkuranAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) LETTER ORDER adopting with modifications (704) Report and Recommendations of Special Master regarding paragraph 11 and Protective Order against subpoenas. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/22/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by City of ChicagoAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Richman, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edmund Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification, #5 Verification)Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(O Connell, Andrew) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report by Construction Laborers Pension Trust for Southern CaliforniaAssociated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Villegas, Carol) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER Canceling Status Conference. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 3/16/2020. Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan Esquerra Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrea Durkee, Nathan EsquerraAssociated Cases: 8:19-cv-00047-PWG et al.(Johnsgard, Amy) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER in Consumer Actions granting in part and denying in part (450) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (451) Motion to Dismiss in case 8:19-md-02879-PWG. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2020 Associated Cases: 8:19-md-02879-PWG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa M Ghannoum. Directing attorney Lisa M Ghannoum to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel R Warren. Directing attorney Daniel R Warren to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa M. Ghannoum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7739810.) by Marriott International Inc.(Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel R. Warren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7739798.) by Marriott International Inc.(Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marriott International Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S Keteltas on behalf of Marriott International Inc. (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Eric Cooper, Clarice Notley, Derrick Palmer, Ethan Schaffer, Alaa Shaaban, Zhaochuan Wang re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Plaxen, Bruce) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Ethan Schaffer, Derrick Palmer, Eric Cooper, Clarice Notley, Alaa Shaaban, Zhaochuan Wang was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Marriott International Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7715709.), filed by Derrick Palmer, Clarice Notley, Alaa Shaaban, Zhaochuan Wang, Ethan Schaffer, Eric Cooper.(Plaxen, Bruce) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gilbert S Keteltas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel R Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa M Ghannoum