This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 07:15:40 (UTC).

NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01795

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

ALEX M. AZAR, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nolan Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

N. Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Patrick Schaefer

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Summons Jessie K. Liu

1 #3

Summons Jeff Sessions

1 #2

Summons to Alex M. Azar, II

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW DISMISSAL against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5612954) filed by NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, #3 Summons Jeff Sessions, #4 Summons Jessie K. Liu)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt

6 #1

Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/2/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/3/2018 to correct case number in the caption) (kt). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/2/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/3/2018 to correct case number in the caption) (kt). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW DISMISSAL against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5612954) filed by NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, #3 Summons Jeff Sessions, #4 Summons Jessie K. Liu)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.