This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2019 at 07:34:13 (UTC).

NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE v. MERKOW et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MERKOW. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa Pupo Lenihan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01471

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE

Defendants

MICHELE S. ROZANSKY

JAMES S. MERKOW

CANDICE DILEMBO MERKOW

RUSS A. MERKOW

ERICA M. STRAUSS

LORI JO TURIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald A. Murday

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60606

Sara G. Janes

Attorney at Chittenden, Murday & Novotny LLC

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

James M. Herb

464 Perry Highway

Pittsburgh, PA 15229

Todd T. Zwikl

Suite 660 Us Steel Building, 600 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) RECEIPT for $316,832.03 from NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE for Deposit into CRIS received on 12/07/18. Receipt No. 24668053497. (jjg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd T. Zwikl on behalf of CANDICE DILEMBO MERKOW. (Zwikl, Todd) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING the #3 North American Company for Life and Health Insurance's Motion to Deposit Its Admitted Liability. Plaintiff is permitted to deposit money with the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk deposit into the Registry of the Court the amount of $316,832.03, plus any applicable interest thereon, which represents the Policy Proceeds of Policy No. LW0002l427. As soon as the business of the office allows, the Clerk will deposit the money into an interest bearing account, the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS), the Disputed Ownership Fund (DOF) under 28 U.S.C. 1335, administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts under 28 U.S.C. 2045, this shall be the only investment mechanism authorized. The custodian, CRIS, is authorized and directed by this Order to deduct the DOF fee for the management of investments and tax administration of the DOF, set by the Judicial Conference, for maintaining accounts deposited with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/28/2018. (jmb) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/28/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

18 #1

Proposed Order Ex. 1

#18

(#18) Errata re #3 Motion to Deposit Funds of Admitted Liability by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. Reason for Correction: To include interest amount in Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex. 1) (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RUSS A. MERKOW. RUSS A. MERKOW waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES S. MERKOW. JAMES S. MERKOW waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

5 #2

Proposed Order

#5

(#8) ORDER GRANTING the #5 Motion for Donald A. Murday to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/05/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#7) ORDER GRANTING the #4 Motion for Sara G. Janes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/05/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#18) Errata re #3 Motion to Deposit Funds of Admitted Liability by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. Reason for Correction: To include interest amount in Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex. 1) (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying Sammons Financial Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CANDICE DILEMBO MERKOW, ERICA M. STRAUSS, LORI JO TURIM, MICHELE S. ROZANSKY, JAMES S. MERKOW and RUSS A. MERKOW,(Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4919969), filed by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RECEIPT for $316,832.03 from NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE for Deposit into CRIS received on 12/07/18. Receipt No. 24668053497. (jjg) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd T. Zwikl on behalf of CANDICE DILEMBO MERKOW. (Zwikl, Todd) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING the #3 North American Company for Life and Health Insurance's Motion to Deposit Its Admitted Liability. Plaintiff is permitted to deposit money with the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk deposit into the Registry of the Court the amount of $316,832.03, plus any applicable interest thereon, which represents the Policy Proceeds of Policy No. LW0002l427. As soon as the business of the office allows, the Clerk will deposit the money into an interest bearing account, the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS), the Disputed Ownership Fund (DOF) under 28 U.S.C. 1335, administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts under 28 U.S.C. 2045, this shall be the only investment mechanism authorized. The custodian, CRIS, is authorized and directed by this Order to deduct the DOF fee for the management of investments and tax administration of the DOF, set by the Judicial Conference, for maintaining accounts deposited with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/28/2018. (jmb) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/28/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Errata re #3 Motion to Deposit Funds of Admitted Liability by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. Reason for Correction: To include interest amount in Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Ex. 1) (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RUSS A. MERKOW. RUSS A. MERKOW waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES S. MERKOW. JAMES S. MERKOW waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHELE S. ROZANSKY. MICHELE S. ROZANSKY waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERICA M. STRAUSS. ERICA M. STRAUSS waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LORI JO TURIM. LORI JO TURIM waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Herb, James) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. CANDICE DILEMBO MERKOW waiver sent on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara G. Janes on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Murday on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Murday, Donald) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING the #5 Motion for Donald A. Murday to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/05/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING the #4 Motion for Sara G. Janes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/05/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/05/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for attorney Donald A. Murday to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920855) by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Murday, Donald) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for attorney Sara G. Janes to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4920849) by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Deposit Funds for Admitted Liability by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement identifying Sammons Financial Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Janes, Sara) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CANDICE DILEMBO MERKOW, ERICA M. STRAUSS, LORI JO TURIM, MICHELE S. ROZANSKY, JAMES S. MERKOW and RUSS A. MERKOW,(Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4919969), filed by NORTH AMERICAN COMPANY FOR LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less