This case was last updated from PACER on 11/12/2018 at 07:23:50 (UTC).

Nordstrom v. Anderson Security Agency Limited et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Nordstrom filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Anderson Security Agency Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michelle H Burns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02880

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michelle H Burns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Nordstrom

Defendants

Kent Oberhelman

Anderson Security Agency Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jody Lynn Broaddus

Attorney at Attorneys for Freedom Law Firm

3185 S Price Rd.

Chandler, AZ 85248

Marc Jeffrey Victor

Attorney at Attorneys for Freedom Law Firm

3185 S Price Rd.

Chandler, AZ 85248

Defendant Attorneys

Shayna Fernandez Watts

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 E Washington St., Ste. 2300

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2555

Jay A Zweig

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4406

Melissa R Costello

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4406

Lauren Elise Davis

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4406

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Fernandez Watts on behalf of Kent Oberhelman. (Watts, Shayna) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#22

(#22) MOTION Defendant Anderson Security Agency, Ltd.'s Motion in Opposition to Plaintiff's Untimely Request for a Jury Trial by Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Lauren) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elise Davis on behalf of Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Davis, Lauren) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

19 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#19

(#19) NOTICE by Susan Nordstrom . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Victor, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Continue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED resetting the Case Management Conference from November 7, 2018 to December 11, 2018 at 11:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns, courtroom 303, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Report is to be filed no less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/1/18. (MSA) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Case Management Conference and Deadline to File the Case Management Report by Susan Nordstrom. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Victor, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#6

(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Zweig, Jay) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Anderson Security Agency Limited. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15952756. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2880-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

1 #4

Declaration

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

*****Additional portion of State Court Record received on 11/01/2018 re: #19 Notice*****ANSWER to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal by Kent Oberhelman.*****filed in State Court on 10/25/2018, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/01/2018 for case management purposes.*****(REK) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Fernandez Watts on behalf of Kent Oberhelman. (Watts, Shayna) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION Defendant Anderson Security Agency, Ltd.'s Motion in Opposition to Plaintiff's Untimely Request for a Jury Trial by Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Lauren) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elise Davis on behalf of Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Davis, Lauren) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • *****Additional portion of State Court Record received on 11/01/2018 re: #19 Notice*****ANSWER to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal by Kent Oberhelman.*****filed in State Court on 10/25/2018, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/01/2018 for case management purposes.*****(REK) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE by Susan Nordstrom . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Victor, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Continue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED resetting the Case Management Conference from November 7, 2018 to December 11, 2018 at 11:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns, courtroom 303, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Report is to be filed no less than seven days before the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 11/1/18. (MSA) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Case Management Conference and Deadline to File the Case Management Report by Susan Nordstrom. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Victor, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Susan Nordstrom. (Victor, Marc) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Susan Nordstrom. (Victor, Marc) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Zweig, Jay) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/17/18. (MSA) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • *****State Court Record received on 9/13/2018*****ANSWER to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal by Anderson Security Agency Limited.*****Docketed in U.S. District Court on 9/13/2018 for case management purposes.*****(REK) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Zweig, Jay) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Anderson Security Agency Limited. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Anderson Security Agency Limited. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15952756. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2880-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Return of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Anderson Security Agency Limited on 8/24/2018. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/27/2018) (KEP) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-096217. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15952756 filed by Anderson Security Agency Limited. (Zweig, Jay) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration)(KEP) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.