This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 08:07:14 (UTC).

Nolan v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Nolan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul J. Barbadoro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01152

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul J. Barbadoro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason R. Nolan

Berlin, NH 03570

Defendants

NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner

Paula Mattis

Raj Pande

Bernadette Campbell

Kathy Belisle

FNU Anzel

Jose Aviles

MHM Solutions, Inc.

Centurion of New Hampshire, LLC.

Keith Batchelder

Edward Dransite

Not Classified By Court

NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)

NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) MOTION for Voluntary Nonsuit and Transfer of Filing Fee Back to Case #18-cv-817-JL filed by Jason R. Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Mail Returned- Rejected- I/M Refused re Notice - ECF, Case Assigned, #2 Filing Fee Omitted Notice.(js) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form.Compliance Deadline set for 2/12/2019.(ej) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (js) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER RE #4 for Voluntary Nonsuit and Transfer of Filing Fee Back to Case #18-cv-817-JL. Text of Order: The court amends its January 18, 2019 Endorsed Order granting Nolan's motion for voluntary nonsuit as follows. Nolan's motion (Doc. No. 4) is accurately construed as notice of voluntary dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), which terminates a lawsuit without court order. Accordingly, the January 18, 2019 Order is amended, in part, to the extent it purported to dismiss the case, as Doc. No. 4, in pertinent part, ended this case without any order. The remaining aspects of the January 18, 2019 Endorsed Order are not affected by this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Voluntary Nonsuit and Transfer of Filing Fee Back to Case #18-cv-817-JL. Text of Order: Nolan asks the court to reapply his one-sixth portion of the $400 filing fee originally paid jointly by the plaintiffs in Case No. 18-cv-817-JL back to that case, as Nolan has taken a voluntary non-suit in his severed case, Case No. 18-cv-1152-PB. Nolan's motion (Doc. No. 4) is granted to the extent that Case No. 18-cv-1152-PB is dismissed without prejudice, and the clerk's office is directed to update the court's records to show that Nolan's portion ($66.67) of the filing fee should be credited back to Steven Roy, the plaintiff in Case No. 18-cv-817-JL. This Order shall be entered in the docket in Case No. 18-cv-817-JL and in Case No. 18-cv-1152-PB. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js) Modified on 1/23/2019 to remove /// (js). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Voluntary Nonsuit and Transfer of Filing Fee Back to Case #18-cv-817-JL filed by Jason R. Nolan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(js) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Mail Returned- Rejected- I/M Refused re Notice - ECF, Case Assigned, #2 Filing Fee Omitted Notice.(js) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form.Compliance Deadline set for 2/12/2019.(ej) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1152-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less