This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2014 at 06:17:28 (UTC).

Nolan et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2013 Nolan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Exxon Mobil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C. Riedlinger and James J. Brady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:13-CV-00439

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen C. Riedlinger

Presiding Judge

James J. Brady

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence J. Alexander

Flora H. Dupree

Joseph B. Eaglin

Mary T. George

Preston A. George, Sr.

Gussie Johnson

Elnora Nolan

Tonga Nolan

Derrick D. Smith

Keisha L. Smith

Defendants

Exxon Mobil Corporation

ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc.

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation

Paul Leinweber

J. Derek Reese

Paul Stratford

Ryan Wong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean Seton Cassidy

Attorney at SmithStag, LLC

365 Canal Street Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ashley M. Liuzza

Attorney at Smith Stag, L.L.C.

365 Canall Street, Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Robert D. McMillin

Attorney at Smith Stag, LLC

One Canal Place, 365 Canal St., Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stuart Housel Smith

Attorney at Smith Stag, LLC - NO

365 Canal Street, Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael G. Stag

Attorney at Smith Stag, LLC - NO

365 Canal Street, Suite 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephen Wussow

Attorney at Smith Stag, LLC

365 Canal St., Ste. 2850

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald G. Franklin

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002-2906

Kelly Beth Hapgood

Attorney at McGuire Woods LP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002-2906

William D. Lampton

Attorney at Jones, Walker - B.R.

8555 United Plaza Boulevard, Suite 500

Baton Rouge, LA 70809-7000

James Conner Percy

Attorney at Jones, Walker - B.R.

8555 United Plaza Boulevard, Suite 500

Baton Rouge, LA 70809-7000

Andrew G. Phillips

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

1230 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309-3534

Lindsey Hargrove Raspino

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002-2906

Angela M. Spivey

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1230 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309-3534

Megan Donohue Breaux

Attorney at Jones Walker, LLP

600 Jefferson Street, Suite 1600

Lafayette, LA 70501

 

Court Documents

1 #6

Attachment Proof of Service

1 #5

Attachment Notice of State Court Removal

1 #4

Affidavit Notice of Filing

1 #3

Attachment State Court Filings

1 #2

Attachment List of Parties & Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

#2

#3

125 #16

Exhibit

125 #15

Exhibit

125 #14

Exhibit

125 #13

Exhibit

125 #12

Exhibit

125 #11

Exhibit

125 #8

Exhibit

125 #5

Exhibit

125 #4

Exhibit

194 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#125) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Attachments by Lawrence J. Alexander, Flora H. Dupree, Joseph B. Eaglin, Mary T. George, Preston A. George, Sr, Gussie Johnson, Tonga Nolan, Keisha L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Proposed Pleading;)(Wussow, Stephen) Modified to edit text on 11/19/2014 (BCL). (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#124) MOTION to Certify Class by Lawrence J. Alexander, Flora H. Dupree, Joseph B. Eaglin, Mary T. George, Preston A. George, Sr, Gussie Johnson, Tonga Nolan, Keisha L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wussow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Kind (Wussow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gale F. Hoffnagle (Wussow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to Hearing on any motion for class certification, or motion to strike the class allegations, is set for 1/7/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. (SWE) (Entered: 11/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John W. deGravelles recused. Case reassigned to Judge James J. Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 11/6/2014. (JDL) (Entered: 11/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) ORDER granting #119 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Sean Seton Cassidy for all plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/6/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Riedlinger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) MOTION to Enroll Sean S. Cassidy as Additional Attorney by Lawrence J. Alexander, Flora H. Dupree, Joseph B. Eaglin, Mary T. George, Preston A. George, Sr, Gussie Johnson, Tonga Nolan, Keisha L. Smith. (Wussow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) Minute Entry/STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger: Telephone Conference held on 10/30/2014. Counsel advised that discovery is proceeding satisfactorily. Expert depositions were delayed slightly but will not impact the remaining deadlines. Counsel were advised that the class certification hearing date is still January 7, 2015, and they will be notified by the district judge if a pre-hearing conference is needed. (LLH) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) NOTICE to Take Deposition of William R. Sawyer, Ph.D., D-ABFM (Spivey, Angela) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Ronald G. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-975773) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 07/31/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Considering the claims of fraudulent joinder and the fact that removal jurisdiction must be established prior to the court considering any claims on the merits; the plaintiffs shall file a brief within 15 days addressing whether this court has removal jurisdiction. Defendants may respond within 15 days of the filing of plaintiff's brief. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/22/2013. (LLH) (Entered: 07/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: This matter be and it is hereby REFERRED to the magistrate judge for a report and recommendation on removal jurisdiction and/or such other action as may be appropriate. The motions #5 , #6 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim are DISMISSED from the court's docket without prejudice to being reurged once removal jurisdiction is established on the record. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/15/2013. (LLH) (Entered: 07/16/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 07/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss by J. Derek Reese, Paul Stratford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 07/12/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 07/09/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mobil Corporation for ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.. (Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 07/09/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corporation for ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc... (Donohue, Megan) (Entered: 07/09/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Case Reassigned to Judge James J. Brady. Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (TMR) (Entered: 07/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 622287. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-965935), filed by ExxonMobil Catalyst Services, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment List of Parties & Pleadings, #3 Attachment State Court Filings, #4 Affidavit Notice of Filing, #5 Attachment Notice of State Court Removal, #6 Attachment Proof of Service)(Percy, James) (Entered: 07/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ExxonMobil Oil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Margarite Spivey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew G. Phillips(Designation Retained)