This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:46:28 (UTC).

NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. v. ALLISON

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against ALLISON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03998

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.

Defendants

RUSSELL ALLISON

RUSSELL ALLISON doing business as ANDY ALLIGATOR'S FUN PARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Geffrey Dean Rainbolt

Attorney at DALE & EKE, PC

9100 Keystone Crossing, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Erick P. Knoblock

Attorney at DALE & EKE PC

9100 Keystone Crossing, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Rabinowitch

Attorney at WOODEN & MCLAUGHLIN LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 1800

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2019

James A. Carter

Attorney at WOODEN & MCLAUGHLIN LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 1800

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2019

Michael D. Gray

Attorney at RAMSEY AND GRAY, P.C.

101 N. Robinson Ave., Suite 725

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Kara N. Ellison

Attorney at RAMSEY AND GRAY, P.C.

101 N. Robinson Ave., Suite 725

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Mail Returned as undeliverable (Return to Sender; Unable to Forward). #18 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct sent to Counsel Geffrey Dean Rainbolt at COOPER & LYBRAND 2900 One American Square, Box 82002, Indianapolis, IN 46282-0002. (NAD) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#25

(#25) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. . (Rainbolt, Geffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Geffrey Dean Rainbolt hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. Geffrey D. Rainbolt (Rainbolt, Geffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER - granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 3/14/2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/1/2019. (NAD) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to March 14, 2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted , filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knoblock, Erick) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting Michael D. Gray's #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON d/b/a ANDY ALLIGATOR'S FUN PARK. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Michael D. Gray and Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/28/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to March 14, 2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted , filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knoblock, Erick) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Submission of additional State Court records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Carter on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Carter, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rabinowitch on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Rabinowitch, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #1

State Court Record State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Complaint, Summonses, Appea

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Civil Court 4, case number 49D04-1811-PL-046045, filed by RUSSELL ALLISON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205533) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Complaint, Summonses, Appearances, Notice of Automatic Enlargment), #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabinowitch, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2018 (REO). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Mail Returned as undeliverable (Return to Sender; Unable to Forward). #18 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct sent to Counsel Geffrey Dean Rainbolt at COOPER & LYBRAND 2900 One American Square, Box 82002, Indianapolis, IN 46282-0002. (NAD) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. . (Rainbolt, Geffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Geffrey Dean Rainbolt hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. Geffrey D. Rainbolt (Rainbolt, Geffrey) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER - granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 3/14/2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/1/2019. (NAD) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to March 14, 2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted , filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knoblock, Erick) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER - granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 3/7/2019 re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/30/2019. (NAD) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #6 Scheduling Order sent to Geffrey Dean Rainbolt. (NAD) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to March 7, 2019 re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knoblock, Erick) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting Michael D. Gray's #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON d/b/a ANDY ALLIGATOR'S FUN PARK. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Michael D. Gray and Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/28/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting Kara N. Ellison's #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON d/b/a ANDY ALLIGATOR'S FUN PARK. Copy to Kara N. Ellison and Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/28/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -IN Judicial caseload profile, #2 Exhibit 2 - OK Judicial caseload profile, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Rabinowitch, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Knoblock, Erick) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement Regarding Notice of Removal by NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Knoblock, Erick) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 10:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Copy to Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/15/2019.(SWM) Modified on 1/15/2019 (SWM). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submission of additional State Court records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Carter on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Carter, James) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rabinowitch on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Rabinowitch, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Civil Court 4, case number 49D04-1811-PL-046045, filed by RUSSELL ALLISON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205533) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Complaint, Summonses, Appearances, Notice of Automatic Enlargment), #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabinowitch, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2018 (REO). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less