This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 08:01:26 (UTC).

Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A. v. Delemora et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Delemora. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-23723

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A.

308 Northwest 75 Street

Miami, FL 33150

Defendants

Sierra L.

Sims M.

Mark Bullard

Marcus Saiz Delemora

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A.. (kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Bullard, Marcus Saiz Delemora, Sierra L., Sims M.. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order Dismissing Case. Order mailed to Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden Auplan, 308 Northwest 75 Street, Miami, FL 33150. (jas) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 9/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A.. (kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Bullard, Marcus Saiz Delemora, Sierra L., Sims M.. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Noble Auplant Bey Executor for Estate Olden A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpe) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.