Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:22:24 (UTC).

Nirvana Health Services, Inc. v. Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Nirvana Health Services, Inc filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-02044

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nirvana Health Services, Inc.

Defendants

Alex M. Azar, II

Seema Verma

Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew M. Fischer

Attorney at Florida Healthcare Law Firm

909 Se 5Th Ave. Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33483

Defendant Attorney

Julie Posteraro

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM

Suite 3100, 400 W Washington St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/11/2019. (SCM) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION to stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Alpha Home Health Solutions by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Posteraro, Julie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/20/2018. (JRJ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #12 Related Case Order by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Fischer, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2018 (RDO). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#13

(#13) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/5/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#12

(#12) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/5/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

2 #7

Exhibit 7

2 #6

Exhibit 6

2 #5

Exhibit 5

2 #4

Exhibit 4

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Posteraro, Julie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/11/2019. (SCM) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Unopposed MOTION to stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Alpha Home Health Solutions by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Interested persons order by Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Posteraro, Julie) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/20/2018. (JRJ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #12 Related Case Order by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Fischer, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2018 (RDO). (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to #14 Response to Motion re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc. (Fischer, Matthew) Modified on 12/14/2018 (JET). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Posteraro, Julie) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/5/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/5/2018. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Set/reset deadlines/hearings: for All Defendants. Answer due by 2/3/2019. (RDO) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; taking under advisement #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and setting briefing schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/29/2018. (JRJ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS issued as to Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(RDO) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against Alex M. Azar, II, Seema Verma filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • FEES paid by Nirvana Health Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 113A-14864350) (SJB) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:18-cv-2044-Orl-40DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #1 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for temporary restraining order by Nirvana Health Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie Posteraro