This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2019 at 08:25:07 (UTC).

Nilhan Developers, LLC v. Westplan Investors Acquisitions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Nilhan Developers, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Westplan Investors Acquisitions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05280

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Appellant

Nilhan Developers, LLC

Debtor

Bay Circle Properties, LLC

Appellees

Accent Cumberland Apartments, LP

Westplan Investors Acquisitions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Roberto Bazzani

Attorney at Weener & Nathan LLP

5887 Glenridge Drive, Ne, Suite 275

Atlanta, GA 30328

M. Denise Dotson

Attorney at M. Denise Dotson, LLC

170 Mitchell Street

Atlanta, GA 30303

Appellee Attorney

Michelle L. Wein

Attorney at Michelle L. Wein, Esq.

Suite 2570, 3340 Peachtree Rd., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

3 #2

15-58440 - Doc654

3 #1

18-5193 - Doc20

#3

(#3) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 18-5193 - Doc20, #2 15-58440 - Doc654)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

2 #17

Doc898

2 #14

Doc679

2 #13

Doc654

2 #12

15-58440 Doc634

2 #11

Docket Report

2 #10

Doc18

2 #9

Doc17

2 #8

Doc13

2 #7

Doc9

2 #6

Doc8

2 #5

Doc7

2 #4

Doc6

2 #3

Doc5

2 #2

Doc4

2 #1

18-5193 Doc1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 18-5193 - Doc20, #2 15-58440 - Doc654)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellants Brief due by 1/17/2019. (rsg) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 18-5193 - Doc1, #2 Doc4, #3 Doc5, #4 Doc6, #5 Doc7, #6 Doc8, #7 Doc9, #8 Doc13, #9 Doc17, #10 Doc18, #11 Docket Report, #12 15-58440 - Doc634, #13 Doc654, #14 Doc679, #15 Doc735, #16 Doc894, #17 Doc898)(Lugo, Yahaira) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 15-58440-WLH, ADV Case#: 18-05193 filed by Nilhan Developers, LLC.. Notice of Appeal filed 11/15/18 from Order entered 11/01/18 by Appellant Nilhan Developers, LLC. Fee Paid: Yes. USBC Receipt No. 49584507. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 12 - NOA, #2 Doc. 10 - Order, #3 Docket Report)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bay Circle Properties, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Denise Dotson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roberto Bazzani