This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 16:23:07 (UTC).

Nike, Inc v. PUMA North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2018 Nike, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PUMA North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-10876

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nike, Inc

Defendant

PUMA North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P. Iwanicki

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, LTD

28Th Floor, 28 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Kimberly S. Devine

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

10 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael J. Harris

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

71 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3600

Chicago, IL 60606

Aaron P. Bowling

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

10 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Kevin Dam

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

10 South Wacker Drive Suite 3000, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Novaira T. Paul

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

10 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Erik S. Maurer

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff

Ten South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher J. Renk

Attorney at Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

10 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence C. Drucker

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Timothy J. Rousseau

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

7 Times Sq

New York, NY 10036

Wayne F. Dennison

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

One Financial Center

Boston, MA 02111

Enrique W. Iturralde

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Vincent J. Rubino, III

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Alessandra C. Messing

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

Seven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #17

Exhibit Q

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PUMA North America, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7123444 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 Category Sheet)(Iwanicki, John) Modified on 5/4/2018 to correct receipt number(Adam, Lucien). (Entered: 05/03/2018)

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #14

Exhibit N

108 #2

Exhibit 31

108 #3

Exhibit 32

108 #1

Exhibit 30

108 #6

Exhibit 35

#108

(#108) Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 35)(Rousseau, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

108 #4

Exhibit 33

108 #5

Exhibit 34

107 #1

Exhibit Ex. O

107 #2

Exhibit Ex. P

290 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 35)(Rousseau, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. O, #2 Exhibit Ex. P)(Dam, Kevin) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) Supplemental JOINT STATEMENT of counsel OF THE NUMBER OF CLAIMS AND TERMS TO BE CONSTRUED. (Rousseau, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#105) NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. The Markman Hearing currently scheduled for 10/8/2019, is reset to 10/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Montes, Mariliz)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #103 Joint Motion to Re-schedule Claim Construction Brief. The Court apologizes for this oversight. The hearing is reset to October 17, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Montes, Mariliz) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct date. NEF regenerated (Montes, Mariliz). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) Joint MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by PUMA North America, Inc..(Rousseau, Timothy) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #101 Nike, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Expert Claim Construction Testimony Deadline. Expert Claim Construction Testimony due by 7/23/2019. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Expert Claim Construction Testimony by Nike, Inc.(Dam, Kevin) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Dam, Kevin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by PUMA North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 Declaration of Darren J. Stefanyshyn Ph.D., P.Eng, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28 Declaration of Michael Steszyn, #29 Exhibit 29)(Rousseau, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • (#10) Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 8/1/2018. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher J. Renk, Erik S. Maurer, Michael J. Harris, Aaron P. Bowling, Kimberly S. Devine, Kevin Dam, and Novaira T. Paul. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to PUMA North America, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Renk, Erik S. Maurer, Michael J. Harris, Aaron P. Bowling, Kimberly S. Devine, Kevin Dam, and Novaira T. Paul Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7123673 by Plaintiff Nike, Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0101-7123715. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Iwanicki, John) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Renk, Erik S. Maurer, Michael J. Harris, Aaron P. Bowling, Kimberly S. Devine, Kevin Dam, and Novaira T. Paul Filing fee: $ 600, receipt number 0101-7123673 by Nike, Inc.(Iwanicki, John) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/4/2018) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2018: #2 Renk Declaration, #3 Maurer Declaration, #4 Harris Declaration, #5 Bowling Declaration, #6 Devine Declaration, #7 Dam Declaration, #8 Paul Declaration) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 5/4/2018 to separate exhibits from motion. Attorney declarations added as attachments (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Iwanicki on behalf of Nike, Inc (Iwanicki, John) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Iwanicki, John) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nike, Inc. (Iwanicki, John) (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PUMA North America, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7123444 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nike, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 Category Sheet)(Iwanicki, John) Modified on 5/4/2018 to correct receipt number(Adam, Lucien). (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.