This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2019 at 07:55:18 (UTC).

Niebuhr, Michael v. The Professional Golfers' Association of America

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 Niebuhr, Michael filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Professional Golfers' Association of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01067

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael S. Niebuhr

Defendant

The Professional Golfers' Association of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan J. Steffes

Attorney at Weld Riley, S.C.

3624 Oakwood Hills Pkwy., P.O. Box 1030

Eau Claire, WI 54702

Defendant Attorney

Tony H. McGrath

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.C.

1 S. Pinckney Street, Suite 930

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (McGrath, Tony) Modified on 2/11/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joseph A. Stadler

#8

(#8) Declaration of Ryan J. Steffes filed by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr re: #6 Motion for Leave to File, #5 Motion to Remand, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joseph A. Stadler, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint) (Steffes, Ryan) Modified on 1/6/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#7

(#7) Brief in Support of #6 Motion for Leave to File, #5 Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr. (Steffes, Ryan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr. (Steffes, Ryan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr. Brief in Opposition due 1/25/2019. Brief in Reply due 2/4/2019. (Steffes, Ryan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#4

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eau Claire County Circuit Court, case number 18-cv-616 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2382826) filed by The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - See #4 ) (McGrath, Tony) Modified on 12/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B - See 4.

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eau Claire County Circuit Court, case number 18-cv-616 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2382826) filed by The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - See #4 ) (McGrath, Tony) Modified on 12/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (arw) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (McGrath, Tony) Modified on 2/11/2019. (lak) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition to #5 Motion to Remand due 2/8/2019. Brief in Reply due 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/31/2019. (arw) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Reset Deadlines and Hearings: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset for 2/22/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (arw) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition to #5 Motion to Remand due 2/4/2019. Brief in Reply due 2/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/23/2019. (arw) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration of Ryan J. Steffes filed by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr re: #6 Motion for Leave to File, #5 Motion to Remand, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joseph A. Stadler, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint) (Steffes, Ryan) Modified on 1/6/2019. (lak) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Brief in Support of #6 Motion for Leave to File, #5 Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr. (Steffes, Ryan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr. (Steffes, Ryan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Michael S. Niebuhr. Brief in Opposition due 1/25/2019. Brief in Reply due 2/4/2019. (Steffes, Ryan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration of Tony H. McGrath re: #1 Notice of Removal. (lak) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (McGrath, Tony) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eau Claire County Circuit Court, case number 18-cv-616 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2382826) filed by The Professional Golfers' Association of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - See #4 ) (McGrath, Tony) Modified on 12/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.