This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2018 at 07:49:12 (UTC).

Nickels v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 Nickels filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence L. Piersol and Veronica L. Duffy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-05069

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

Referral Judge

Veronica L. Duffy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Auralee Ann Nickels

Defendant

Nancy Berryhill

Interested Party

Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron D. Eiesland

Attorney at Johnson, Eiesland Law Offices, PC

4020 Jackson Boulevard #1

Rapid City, SD 57702

Defendant Attorney

Delia M. Druley (USA)

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

Interested Party Attorney

Office of General Counsel - Dallas

Attorney at Social Security Administration

1301 Young Street, Suite A702

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #4

AO_085

3 #3

Summons - Attorney General

3 #2

Summons - Parsons

3 #1

Summons - Berryhill

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to USA. 3 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Berryhill, #2 Summons - Parsons, #3 Summons - Attorney General, #4 AO_085)(SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Auralee Ann Nickels in shell case on 9/11/2018. (SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Delia M. Druley (USA) on behalf of Nancy Berryhill. (Druley (USA), Delia) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to USA. 3 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Berryhill, #2 Summons - Parsons, #3 Summons - Attorney General, #4 AO_085)(SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Filing Fee Received from Auralee Ann Nickels. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #0869-2872745. (SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Auralee Ann Nickels in shell case on 9/11/2018. (SLT) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less