This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2018 at 09:12:51 (UTC).

Niazi Licensing Corporation v. Boston Scientific Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 Niazi Licensing Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Franklin L. Noel, Joan N. Ericksen, Becky R. Thorson and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:17-CV-05094

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Franklin L. Noel

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judges

Joan N. Ericksen

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Niazi Licensing Corporation

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Boston Scientific Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

J Ashwin Madia

Attorney at Madia Law LLC

345 Union Plaza, 333 Washington Avenue North

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Zane A. Umsted

Attorney at Madia Law LLC

333 Washington Ave N. #345

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Joshua A Newville

Attorney at Madia Law LLC

323 Washington Ave N., #200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Cody Blades

Attorney at Madia Law

333 Washington Ave N.

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Michael T. Griggs

Attorney at Boyle Fredrickson, S.C.

840 N. Plankinton Ave

Milwaukee, WI 53203

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Timothy E Grimsrud

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

90 S 7Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402-3901

David J F Gross

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

90 S 7Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402-3901

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

90 S 7Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402-3901

Lauren J.F. Frank

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

90 S 7Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402-3901

Eva B Stensvad

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

90 S 7Th St Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55402-3901

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Consent Form

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LPH) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. (Griggs, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 17cv5095 MJD/HB and 17cv5096 WMW/HB have been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Becky Thorson. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 1/3/18. (LPH) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 17-cv-5094 WMW/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/26/17. (LPH) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Counter Claimant Boston Scientific Corp., Defendant Boston Scientific Corp.. (Grimsrud, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Niazi Licensing Corporation. filed by Boston Scientific Corp.. (Grimsrud, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case Nos. 17-cv-5094 and 17-cv-5096 be assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Hildy Bowbeer, nunc pro tunc, and the Clerk of Court is directed to void and reuse the cards on the same list pursuant to this Court's Assignment of Cases Order dated July 5, 2017. Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 17cv5094 WMW/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/5/17. (AKL) (Entered: 12/07/2017)

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE AND STIPULATION REGARDING BSC'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Acknowledgement filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. (Griggs, Michael) Modified text on 11/29/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 11/28/2017)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. Griggs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5816676 filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. (Madia, J) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corp. (LPH) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A: '268 patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corp. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5812348) filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: '268 patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Madia, J) Modified text on 11/13/2017 (LPH). (Entered: 11/13/2017)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • (#16) (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference, originally set for 2/12/2018, is reset to 02/16/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(LPH) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. (Griggs, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 17cv5095 MJD/HB and 17cv5096 WMW/HB have been reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Becky Thorson. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 1/3/18. (LPH) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 17-cv-5094 WMW/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/26/17. (LPH) (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Counter Claimant Boston Scientific Corp., Defendant Boston Scientific Corp.. (Grimsrud, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Niazi Licensing Corporation. filed by Boston Scientific Corp.. (Grimsrud, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • (#9) TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case Nos. 17-cv-5094 and 17-cv-5096 be assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Hildy Bowbeer, nunc pro tunc, and the Clerk of Court is directed to void and reuse the cards on the same list pursuant to this Court's Assignment of Cases Order dated July 5, 2017. Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 17cv5094 WMW/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/5/17. (AKL) (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE AND STIPULATION REGARDING BSC'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Acknowledgement filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. (Griggs, Michael) Modified text on 11/29/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael T. Griggs for Niazi Licensing Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 11/15/2017. (JLW) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. Griggs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5816676 filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. (Madia, J) (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corp. (LPH) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael T. Griggs, Sarah M. Wong, Kyle M. Costello as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (LPH) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd, 4th - Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17-cv-5094 JNE/FLN. (LPH) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corp. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-5812348) filed by Niazi Licensing Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: '268 patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Madia, J) Modified text on 11/13/2017 (LPH). (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less