This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2018 at 08:10:44 (UTC).

Newsome et al v. Tull et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Newsome filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tull. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vicki Miles-LaGrange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00791

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vicki Miles-LaGrange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JB Newsome, Sr

Amanda Lynn Deatherage

Defendants

Crete Carrier Corporation

Justin Tull

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tom M Cummings

Attorney at Tom M Cummings Inc

701 Nw 13Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103-2206

Dan Murdock

Attorney at Law Office of Dan Murdock

3037 Nw 63Rd St, Suite 151W

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

Defendant Attorneys

Mehry Taremi

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

Daniel K Jones

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AMENDED NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 02:50 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (ks) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#6

(#6) NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 02:50 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (ks) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom M Cummings on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom M Cummings on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Crete Carrier Corporation, Justin Tull (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Crete Carrier Corporation, Justin Tull (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Answer

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2018-35 filed by Justin Tull, Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 02:50 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (ks) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018 02:50 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (ks) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom M Cummings on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2757901. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Tom M Cummings on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cummings, Tom) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Crete Carrier Corporation, Justin Tull (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Crete Carrier Corporation, Justin Tull (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2018-35 filed by Justin Tull, Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crete Carrier Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel K Jones

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mehry Taremi