This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 07:45:00 (UTC).

New Age Chemical LLC v. Tersus Environmental LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 New Age Chemical LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tersus Environmental LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01605

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

New Age Chemical, LLC

New Age Chemical LLC

Defendants

Bethany McClain

Tersus Environmental, LLC

Bethany McLain

Tersus Environmental LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald J Mayhew

Attorney at Mayhew Law Office

12750 W North Ave - Ste B

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorney

Robert E Knoer

Attorney at The Knoer Group PLLC

424 Main St - Ste 1820

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) DECLARATION of Attorney Robert E. Knoer, Esq. in support to Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Knoer, Robert)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bethany McLain, Tersus Environmental LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Knoer, Robert)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bethany McLain, Tersus Environmental LLC re #9 MOTION for Order Permitting Telephonic Deposition . (Knoer, Robert)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed - defendant Tersus Environmental LLC served on 11/13/2018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Age Chemical LLC as to Tersus (Mayhew, Gerald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (vkb)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed - defendant Bethany McLain served on 11/29/2018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Age Chemical LLC on Bethany McLaiin (Mayhew, Gerald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (vkb)

14 #4

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Entity Info

14 #3

Affidavit Affidavit of Bethany McLain

14 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Gary Birk

#9

(#17) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bethany McLain, Tersus Environmental LLC re #9 MOTION for Order Permitting Telephonic Deposition . (Knoer, Robert)

#8

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bethany McLain, Tersus Environmental LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Knoer, Robert)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

#5

(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by New Age Chemical, LLC. (Mayhew, Gerald)

#3

(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical, LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical, LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by New Age Chemical, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2941555)(Mayhew, Gerald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) DECLARATION of Attorney Robert E. Knoer, Esq. in support to Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Knoer, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bethany McLain, Tersus Environmental LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Knoer, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bethany McLain, Tersus Environmental LLC re #9 MOTION for Order Permitting Telephonic Deposition . (Knoer, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #16 Certificate of Service filed by New Age Chemical LLC and #15 Certificate of Service filed by New Age Chemical LLC; The incorrect event was chosen. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed - defendant Tersus Environmental LLC served on 11/13/2018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Age Chemical LLC as to Tersus (Mayhew, Gerald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #14 Redacted MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Tersus Environmental LLC, Bethany McLain. The affidavits, declarations, and brief in support should have been filed as separate entries. These documents do not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed - defendant Bethany McLain served on 11/29/2018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Age Chemical LLC on Bethany McLaiin (Mayhew, Gerald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (vkb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Redacted Note of Motion and MOTION to Dismiss OR Stay Pending Arbitration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Declaration of Robert E. Knoer, #2 Affidavit of Gary Birk, #3 Affidavit of Bethany McLain, #4 Ex. 1 - Entity Info, #5 Ex. 2 - McLain's W2s, #6 Ex. 3 - CSP Entity Info, #7 Ex. 4 - Draft Distributor Agreements, #8 Ex. 5 - US v. James A. Stuart, Jr., #9 Ex. 6 - Ad & Spec Sheets, #10 Ex. 7 - Product Info & Spec Sheet, #11 Exhibit Product Info & Spec Sheet, #12 Ex. 9 - Pl's Cease & Desist Letter, #13 Exhibit Tech Brief & MSDS for EDS-ER, #14 Exhibit Patent Filing Receipt, #15 Ex. 11 - Patent Abandonment, #16 Ex. 13 - LinkedIn Search, #17 Ex. 14 - Defs' Response to Pl's Cease & Desist, #18 Defs' Memorandum of Law, #19 List Index to Exhibits)(Knoer, Robert) Modified on 12/6/2018 (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • NOTICE from the clerk to defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Knoer, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by New Age Chemical LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mayhew, Gerald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared in a fillable format. The attached summons do not contain the second page - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by New Age Chemical, LLC. (Mayhew, Gerald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical, LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by New Age Chemical, LLC (Mayhew, Gerald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by New Age Chemical, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2941555)(Mayhew, Gerald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.