This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:09:59 (UTC).

Nettles v. Hilton Worldwide, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 Nettles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Hilton Worldwide, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04102

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Nettles

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

Hilton Worldwide, Inc.

River Greenway Hospitality, LLC

ABC Limited Liability Companies 21 through 30

Main and Main, L.L.C.

Roe Corporations 11 through 20

River Greenway Hospitality, LLC a limited liability company in the State of South Dakota doing business as Hilton Garden Inn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen C. Landon

Attorney at Cadwell, Sanford, Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Christian M. Morris

Attorney at Nettles Law Firm

1389 Galleria Drive, Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89014

Defendant Attorney

Michael F. Tobin

Attorney at Boyce Law Firm, LLP

300 South Main Avenue, Po Box 5015

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Letter to counsel

#11

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2019 Motions due by 10/1/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 02:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/25/18. (SLW) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christian M. Morris. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/18/18. (DJP) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Discovery Report re #10 Order for Discovery Report of Parties Rule 26 Meetng by Angela Nettles. Related document: #10 Order for Discovery Report.(Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Attorney Christian M. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2860624) by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen) Modified on 9/17/2018 to reflect payment from doc #7 (SLW). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(DJP) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Tobin, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Hilton Worldwide, Inc. on 8-28-18 (Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney Christian M. Morris to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2860624) by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen) Modified on 9/17/2018 (SAC). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Main and Main, LLC on 8-20-18, filed by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of River Greenway Hospitality LLC served on River Greenway Hospitality, LLC on 8-20-18, filed by Angela Nettles. (Landon, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Main and Main, L.L.C., River Greenway Hospitality, LLC. 3 original summons, 4 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (JLS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing Fee Received from Angela Nettles. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400047759. (JLS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (JLS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Angela Nettles. (JLS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Main and Main, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian Morris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Landon