This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2017 at 02:29:46 (UTC).

Nemo v. RR Donnelley/Logistics Services (JOINT ASSIGN) (MAG+)

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 Nemo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against RR Donnelley/Logistics Services JOINT ASSIGN MAG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02130

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve J. Nemo

Prattville, AL 36067

Defendant

RR Donnelley/Logistics Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Stacey Thurman Bradford

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

420 20Th Street North, Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35203

Felicia Teanna Long

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON

420 20Th Street North Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Alexandra S. for RR Donnelley/Logistics Services served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

1 #2

Receipt

1 #1

Attachments

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#3

(#3) INFORMATION of the pro se party for Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of the pro se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to RR Donnelley/Logistics Services; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/3/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

#7

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Alexandra S. for RR Donnelley/Logistics Services served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

#20

(#20) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:17-cv-00734. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/19/2017)

20 #1

*Restricted*

#19

(#19) ORDER pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division; DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/19/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#18

(#18) NOTIFICATION of Intent by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#13

(#13) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the parties in writing why this case should not be transferred to USDC for the Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division, in the interest of justice pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a), as further set out in order; Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2017; further ORDERED that the parties shall not file any briefs or evidence as to dft's #8 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for summary judgment until the court rules on the issue of venue and a briefing order is entered; Copies mailed CMRRR and regular mail to plf. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/28/2017. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

#17

(#17) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Written Consent to Non-Oppose Transfer Venue) by Steve J. Nemo re #13 Order to Show Cause. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)

#16

(#16) Return Receipt Card showing service of #13 Order to Show Cause signed by Steve J. Nemo on 12/1/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Written Consent to Transfer Venue) by RR Donnelley/Logistics Services re #13 Order to Show Cause. (Bradford, Stacey) Modified on 11/30/2017 to clarify the docket text (alm, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

#11

(#14) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by RR Donnelley/Logistics Services re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bradford, Stacey) Modified on 11/30/2017 to add the link to the #11 Notice (alm, ).[Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:17-cv-00734. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division; DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/19/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTIFICATION of Intent by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Written Consent to Non-Oppose Transfer Venue) by Steve J. Nemo re #13 Order to Show Cause. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Return Receipt Card showing service of #13 Order to Show Cause signed by Steve J. Nemo on 12/1/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Written Consent to Transfer Venue) by RR Donnelley/Logistics Services re #13 Order to Show Cause. (Bradford, Stacey) Modified on 11/30/2017 to clarify the docket text (alm, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by RR Donnelley/Logistics Services re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bradford, Stacey) Modified on 11/30/2017 to add the link to the #11 Notice (alm, ).[Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the parties in writing why this case should not be transferred to USDC for the Northern District of Alabama, Southern Division, in the interest of justice pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a), as further set out in order; Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2017; further ORDERED that the parties shall not file any briefs or evidence as to dft's #8 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion for summary judgment until the court rules on the issue of venue and a briefing order is entered; Copies mailed CMRRR and regular mail to plf. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/28/2017. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to seal Doc. #10 -1. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/28/2017. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RR Donnelley/Logistics Services. (Bradford, Stacey) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by RR Donnelley/Logistics Services. (Bradford, Stacey). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/28/2017 (alm, ). Modified on 11/28/2017 to clarify the docket text (alm, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by Alexandra S. for RR Donnelley/Logistics Services served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to Magistrate Judge Honorable Susan Russ Walker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/3/2017. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to RR Donnelley/Logistics Services; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of the pro se party to Participate in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMATION of the pro se party for Participation in the Pro Se Assistance Program by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steve J. Nemo. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steve J. Nemo. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against RR Donnelley/Logistics Services (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602047251.), filed by Steve J. Nemo. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Receipt)(wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 12/19/2017.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.