This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:13 (UTC).

Nemhauser et al v. Federal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Nemhauser filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00447

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lubomir Jastrzebski

Nancy Nemhauser

Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Scott Constable

Attorney at Constable Law, P.A.

323 Main Street

Safety Harbor, FL 34695

Defendant Attorneys

William Roderick Lewis

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4327

Donald Grayson Kelly

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4327

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/10/2019, Dispositive motions due by 6/14/2019, Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, JANUARY 7, 2020 at 10:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr., Jury Trial set for FEBRUARY 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/19/2018. (AD) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2018. (AD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company.(Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Federal Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Originally filed in State Court on 7/11/2018) filed by Nancy Nemhauser, Lubomir Jastrzebski.(LAB) Modified on 8/27/2018 (LAB). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Policyexhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Lake County. case number 35-2018-CA-001423 filed in State Court on 7/11/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number OCA - 9547 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Policy, #2 State Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAB) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lubomir Jastrzebski, Nancy Nemhauser. Related case(s): yes (Constable, James) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Freeman, Allison) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

1 #2

State Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/12/2019, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/12/2018. (HAQ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/10/2019, Dispositive motions due by 6/14/2019, Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, JANUARY 7, 2020 at 10:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr., Jury Trial set for FEBRUARY 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 9/19/2018. (AD) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Freeman, Allison) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company.(Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lubomir Jastrzebski, Nancy Nemhauser. Related case(s): yes (Constable, James) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Federal Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Kelly, Donald) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/28/2018. (AD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Originally filed in State Court on 7/11/2018) filed by Nancy Nemhauser, Lubomir Jastrzebski.(LAB) Modified on 8/27/2018 (LAB). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Lake County. case number 35-2018-CA-001423 filed in State Court on 7/11/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number OCA - 9547 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Policy, #2 State Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAB) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.