This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2018 at 07:48:15 (UTC).

Nelson v. Warren County, Tennessee et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Nelson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Warren County, Tennessee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nickey Reese

Meigabelle Leigh Anna South

Clarence Kelly Nelson

Kaylor Landon Reese

Defendants

Christy Lee Sturgill

Joseph Caten

Warren County, Tennessee

Center for Advanced Medicine, LLC

Jackie Matheny

David G Florence

Eddie Knowles

Unknown Supervisors

Kristina Renee Cannon

Sheriff Jackie Matheny

Dr. David G Florence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton M Whittaker

Attorney at McKoon, Williams, Atchley & Stanley, PLLC

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 1500

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Defendant Attorneys

Randall A York

Attorney at Moore, Rader, Fitzpatrick and York, P. C.

P O Box 3347

Cookeville, TN 38502

Daniel H Rader, III

Attorney at Moore, Rader, Fitzpatrick and York, P. C.

P O Box 3347

Cookeville, TN 38502

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/13/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/26/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#19

(#19) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/12/2018, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/23/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants, Warren County, Tennessee; Christy Lee Sturgill, R.N.; Joseph Caten, L.P.N.; Kristina Renee Cannon, L.P.N.; Sheriff Jackie Matheny; and Eddie Knowles, have until November 30, 2018 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/22/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/22/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Randall A York on behalf of Kristina Renee Cannon, Joseph Caten, Eddie Knowles, Jackie Matheny, Christy Lee Sturgill, Warren County, Tennessee (York, Randall) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

15 #1

Other Proposed Agreed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kristina Renee Cannon, Joseph Caten, Eddie Knowles, Jackie Matheny, Christy Lee Sturgill, Warren County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order)(Rader, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Rader, III on behalf of Kristina Renee Cannon, Joseph Caten, Eddie Knowles, Jackie Matheny, Christy Lee Sturgill, Warren County, Tennessee (Rader, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Warren County, Tennessee served on 10/3/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

1 #12

Exhibit C

1 #10

Exhibit A

1 #8

Summons Matheny

1 #7

Summons Warren County

1 #4

Summons Dr. Florence

1 #3

Summons Caten

1 #2

Summons Cannon

1 #1

Other Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3775280.), filed by Meigabelle Leigh Anna South, Kaylor Landon Reese, Clarence Kelly Nelson, Nickey Reese. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Cannon, #3 Summons Caten, #4 Summons Dr. Florence, #5 Summons CAM, LLC, #6 Summons Sturgill, #7 Summons Warren County, #8 Summons Matheny, #9 Summons Eddie Knowles, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/13/2018, at 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/26/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/12/2018, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/23/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants, Warren County, Tennessee; Christy Lee Sturgill, R.N.; Joseph Caten, L.P.N.; Kristina Renee Cannon, L.P.N.; Sheriff Jackie Matheny; and Eddie Knowles, have until November 30, 2018 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/22/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 10/22/2018. (CMH) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Randall A York on behalf of Kristina Renee Cannon, Joseph Caten, Eddie Knowles, Jackie Matheny, Christy Lee Sturgill, Warren County, Tennessee (York, Randall) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kristina Renee Cannon, Joseph Caten, Eddie Knowles, Jackie Matheny, Christy Lee Sturgill, Warren County, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order)(Rader, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Rader, III on behalf of Kristina Renee Cannon, Joseph Caten, Eddie Knowles, Jackie Matheny, Christy Lee Sturgill, Warren County, Tennessee (Rader, Daniel) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Warren County, Tennessee served on 10/3/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Jackie Matheny served on 10/1/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Eddie Knowles served on 10/1/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Christy Lee Sturgill served on 10/1/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Joseph Caten served on 10/1/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. Kristina Renee Cannon served on 10/1/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clarence Kelly Nelson. David G Florence served on 10/1/2018. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/24/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/24/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/24/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3775280.), filed by Meigabelle Leigh Anna South, Kaylor Landon Reese, Clarence Kelly Nelson, Nickey Reese. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Cannon, #3 Summons Caten, #4 Summons Dr. Florence, #5 Summons CAM, LLC, #6 Summons Sturgill, #7 Summons Warren County, #8 Summons Matheny, #9 Summons Eddie Knowles, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C)(Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Center for Advanced Medicine, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Warren County, Tennessee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayton M Whittaker