This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2018 at 06:30:09 (UTC).

Nelson, Antoine et al v. Stevens, Christopher et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 Nelson, Antoine filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stevens, Christopher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antoine C. Nelson

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendants

DAI Security Chief Mark Weigerber

James Schwochert

Marc Clements

Warden Scott Eckstein

Ms. Jodene Perttu

Mr. Weber

Officer Debroux

Ms. Lisa Horneck

Capt. James Elsinger

Capt. Christopher Stevens

Deputy Warden Steve Schueler

Security Director John Kind

Ms. Heil

Not Classified By Court

GBCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Motion for Expedited Screening of #1 Complaint and Immediate Briefing and Hearing on #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#6

(#6) Sworn Statement of Facts filed by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson re: #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief with Incorporated Brief-in-Support by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Letter from Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson requesting to use of release account funds to pay full filing fee. (Letter also filed at dkt. #1 , attachment 1.) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#2

(#2) Declaration of Antoine Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Antoine C. Nelson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (nln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2018: #2 Envelope) (nln). (Entered: 04/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion for Expedited Screening of #1 Complaint and Immediate Briefing and Hearing on #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Sworn Statement of Facts filed by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson re: #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief with Incorporated Brief-in-Support by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement from 2/17/2018 through 3/2/2018 by Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Plaintiff Antoine C. Nelson requesting to use of release account funds to pay full filing fee. (Letter also filed at dkt. #1 , attachment 1.) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration of Antoine Nelson. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Antoine C. Nelson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (nln) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2018: #2 Envelope) (nln). (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less