This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2019 at 07:01:26 (UTC).

Neeld v. Integrated Device Technology, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 Neeld filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Integrated Device Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Illston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-07217

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Illston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Neeld

Defendants

Ken Kannappan

Gordon W Parnell

Selena L Lacroix

Norm Taffe

Integrated Device Technology, Inc.

Gregory L Waters

Robert A Rango

Umesh Padval

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel E. Elkins

Attorney at WeissLaw LLP

9107 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 450

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docket(#10) Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Selena L Lacroix waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Norm Taffe waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Robert A Rango waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Gordon W Parnell waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Umesh Padval waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Ken Kannappan waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Gregory L Waters waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jonathan Neeld. Service waived by Integrated Device Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Integrated Device Technology, Inc., Ken Kannappan, Selena L Lacroix, Umesh Padval, Gordon W Parnell, Robert A Rango, Norm Taffe, Gregory L Waters ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12884563.). Filed byJonathan Neeld. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integrated Device Technology, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel E. Elkins