This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:42:57 (UTC).

Navy Federal Credit Union v. LTD Financial Services, LP et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Navy Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LTD Financial Services, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01424

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Navy Federal Credit Union

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Debt Management Partners, LLC

Advantage Assets II, Inc.

John Does #1 - #3

LTD Financial Services, LP

Bayview Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

James Wells Harrell

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP (DC)

5301 Wisconsin Ave Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20015-2015

Jonathan Russell Knight

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP (DC)

1401 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michael Patrick Fortkort

Attorney at Michael P Fortkort PC

13164 Lazy Glen Ln

Oak Hill, VA 20171

James S. Kurz

Attorney at Redmon Peyton & Braswell LLP

510 King Street, Suite 301

Alexandria, VA 22314

J. William Eshelman, III

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC (DC-NA)

1001 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 1300 South

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

114 #1

Proposed Order

#114

(#114) RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION to Seal Opposition to LTD's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debt Management Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#113

(#113) ORDER - The discovery in this case is STAYED for two (2) weeks from the date of this Order. The parties are instructed to contact the undersigned's Chambers to provide a status update prior to the expiration of the stay. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on the parties' various Motions to Dismiss, currently scheduled for January 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled by the Court for a future date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/11/2019. (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#112

(#112) RESPONSE in Support re #72 MOTION to Strike #52 Amended Complaint filed by Bayview Solutions LLC. (Eshelman, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#99

(#114) RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION to Seal Opposition to LTD's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debt Management Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

72 #1

Motion to Strike

#72

(#112) RESPONSE in Support re #72 MOTION to Strike #52 Amended Complaint filed by Bayview Solutions LLC. (Eshelman, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

52 #1

Proposed Summons

#52

(#112) RESPONSE in Support re #72 MOTION to Strike #52 Amended Complaint filed by Bayview Solutions LLC. (Eshelman, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Memorandum in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

Set Deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (Attorney has been notify to file Amended Notice of Hearing - No motions hearing on 11/23/18 - Deadlines Terminated) (klau, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #4

Proposed Summons (LTD)

1 #3

Proposed Summons (DMP)

1 #2

Proposed Summons (AAII)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6368824.), filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (AAII), #3 Proposed Summons (DMP), #4 Proposed Summons (LTD))(Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

183 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION to Seal Opposition to LTD's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debt Management Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • ***Motion Hearing terminated (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) ORDER - The discovery in this case is STAYED for two (2) weeks from the date of this Order. The parties are instructed to contact the undersigned's Chambers to provide a status update prior to the expiration of the stay. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on the parties' various Motions to Dismiss, currently scheduled for January 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled by the Court for a future date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/11/2019. (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) RESPONSE in Support re #72 MOTION to Strike #52 Amended Complaint filed by Bayview Solutions LLC. (Eshelman, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) RESPONSE in Support re #71 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bayview Solutions LLC. (Eshelman, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) Memorandum in Opposition re #93 MOTION to Seal Its Opposition to Debt Management Partner's Motion to Dismiss filed by Debt Management Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Amended Complaint Counts 1 through 5 filed by LTD Financial Services, LP. (Kurz, James) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #107 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C), #92 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition, #106 MOTION to Seal Selected Exhibits to David E. Gutowski's Declaration in Support of Debt Management Partners, LLC's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David E. Gutowski with Exhibits A, B and C)(Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Debt Management Partners, LLC re #106 MOTION to Seal Selected Exhibits to David E. Gutowski's Declaration in Support of Debt Management Partners, LLC's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) MOTION to Seal Selected Exhibits to David E. Gutowski's Declaration in Support of Debt Management Partners, LLC's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Debt Management Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fortkort, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Advantage Assets II, Inc., Debt Management Partners, LLC, LTD Financial Services, LP. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (lcre, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2018: #1 Notice) (lcre, ). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #6 Notice of Hearing Date, The filing user has been notified that motions will not be heard on 11/23/18 and has been instructed to renotice the motion. (klau, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (Attorney has been notify to file Amended Notice of Hearing - No motions hearing on 11/23/18 - Deadlines Terminated) (klau, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/23/2018 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Affidavit of Janelle Allison by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Memorandum in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6368824.), filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (AAII), #3 Proposed Summons (DMP), #4 Proposed Summons (LTD))(Harrell, James) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayview Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Debt Management Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Advantage Assets II, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where LTD FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant