This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2018 at 08:21:21 (UTC).

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY v. PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-04638

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY

Petitioners

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALTER H. SWAYZE, III

JOSEPH A. HINKHOUSE

COLLEEN P. SORENSEN

MICHELLE L. GOYKE

Petitioner Attorneys

KEITH MOSKOWITZ

SAMANTHA J. WENGER

JOHN I. GROSSBART

MELISSA A. CORNIBE

Defendant Attorneys

MIRANDA JANNUZZI

JOHN N. ELLISON

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

18 #2

Certificate of Service

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

17 #2

Certificate of Service

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheets

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SAMANTHA J. WENGER, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/20/2018.12/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND TO SAMANTHA J. WENGER WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF KEITH MOSKOWITZ, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/20/2018.12/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO KEITH MOSKOWITZ WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOHN GROSSBART, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/20/2018.12/20/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Samantha Wenger ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13241652.) filed by VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY.Application. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Samantha Wenger ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13241625.) filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY.Application. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Keith Moskowitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13241578.) filed by VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY.Application. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Keith Moskowitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13241540.) filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY.Application. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John I. Grossbart ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13241519.) filed by VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY.Application. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John I. Grossbart filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY.Application. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORNIBE, MELISSA) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CNA FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent THE CONTINENTAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PENNSYLVANIA, Corporate Parent LOEWS CORPORATION for CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY. by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
12/13/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHELLE L. GOYKE, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #6 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/13/2018.12/13/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO MICHELLE GOYKE WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF JOSEPH A. HINKHOUSE, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO. #5 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/13/2018.12/13/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Colleen P. Sorensen ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13224035.) filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY.Declaration and Certificate of Service.(SWAYZE, WALTER) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michelle L. Goyke ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13224025.) filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY.Declaration and Certificate of Service.(SWAYZE, WALTER) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Joseph A. Hinkhouse, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13223905.) filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY.Declartion and Certifcate of Service.(SWAYZE, WALTER) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by MIRANDA JANNUZZI on behalf of PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC. with Certificate of Service(JANNUZZI, MIRANDA) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC..(ELLISON, JOHN) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC.. PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/13/2019. (ELLISON, JOHN) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2018

DocketSummons Issued as to PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/30/2018 (ahf) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PERNIX THERAPEUTICS HOLDINGS INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 186986.), filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less