This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:08:53 (UTC).

Natural Organics, Inc. v. Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Natural Organics, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05814

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natural Organics, Inc.

Defendant

Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Joseph Monaco

Attorney at Swanson, Martin & Bell, LLP

330 North Wabash Ave., Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Brittany Lynn Gilhooly

Attorney at Swanson, Martin And Bell, Llp

330 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60611

Allan E Anderson

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West Fifth Street, 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Ross Q. Panko

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

1717 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

martin E jerisat

Attorney at Jerisat Law

1600 N. Broadway, Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92706

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Salud (Gilhooly, Brittany) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal #16 , this case is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Allan E. Anderson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14977209. (Anderson, Allan) Modified on 9/21/2018 (is, ). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc. by Martin E Jerisat (Jerisat, Martin) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14930497. (Panko, Ross) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Ross Q. Panko's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Natural Organics, Inc. (Gilhooly, Brittany) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natural Organics, Inc. as to Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc. on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Gilhooly, Brittany) Modified on 9/5/2018 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 10/24/2018 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natural Organics, Inc. by Brittany Lynn Gilhooly (Gilhooly, Brittany) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#5

(#5) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natural Organics, Inc. by Anthony Joseph Monaco (Monaco, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Monaco, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal #16 , this case is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Salud (Gilhooly, Brittany) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Allan E. Anderson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Allan E. Anderson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice(is, ) Modified on 9/21/2018 (is, ). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14977209. (Anderson, Allan) Modified on 9/21/2018 (is, ). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc. by Martin E Jerisat (Jerisat, Martin) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney Ross Q. Panko's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 on behalf of the plaintiff is granted. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14930497. (Panko, Ross) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Natural Organics, Inc. (Gilhooly, Brittany) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natural Organics, Inc. as to Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc. on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Gilhooly, Brittany) Modified on 9/5/2018 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 10/24/2018 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Salud Natural Entrepreneur, Inc. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natural Organics, Inc. by Brittany Lynn Gilhooly (Gilhooly, Brittany) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (acm) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Natural Organics, Inc. by Anthony Joseph Monaco (Monaco, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Monaco, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Natural Organics, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14870602. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Monaco, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.