Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:57:35 (UTC).

National Funding, Inc v. Ryan Hinton Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 National Funding, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ryan Hinton Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew G. Schopler and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02818

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Funding, Inc.

Respondents

Ryan Hinton Inc

does 1-10, inclusive

Robert Ryan Hinton

Ryan Hinton Inc an Idaho corporation doing business as Ryan Hinton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer E. Duty

Attorney at NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.

9820 Towne Centre Dr., Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92121

Respondent Attorneys

Linda G Workman

Attorney at Dicks and Workman APC

750 B Street Suite 2720

San Diego, CA 92101

Joseph G Dicks

Attorney at Dicks and Workman APC

750 B Street Suite 2720

San Diego, CA 92101-8122

Joseph Gary Dicks

Attorney at Dicks and Workman Attorneys At Law APC

750 B Street, Suite 1820

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/25/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/1/2019.(acc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

14 #1

Proof of Service

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION To Allow Party Representatives to Appear at ENEC Telephonically by Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) (acc). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

13 #1

Proof of Service

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Gary Dicks (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) (acc). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 12/18/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) Modified on 12/27/2018 to correct year, NEF regenerated (yeb). (Entered: 12/18/2018)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-10182. Original file received electronically (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION REQUESTING CHANGE OF VENUE by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Case transferred electronically. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2018)

8 #2

Certificate of Service

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #7 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2018)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

(#7) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Change Venue to Southern District of California filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/25/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/1/2019.(acc) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • (#17) MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On January 30, 2019, the Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. The case did not settle. By January 31, 2019, at 2:30 p.m., defense counsel must call Judge Schopler's chambers to provide a date for a continued ENE. A scheduling order will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 01/30/2019. (no document attached) (mjg) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dicks, Joseph)(acc). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to excuse the personal appearances of their party representatives at the January 30, 2019 Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No. #14 ) is denied. The party representatives must appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 01/17/2019. (no document attached) (mjg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION To Allow Party Representatives to Appear at ENEC Telephonically by Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) (acc). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Gary Dicks (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) (acc). (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 12/18/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) Modified on 12/27/2018 to correct year, NEF regenerated (yeb). (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • (#11) Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-10182. Original file received electronically (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION REQUESTING CHANGE OF VENUE by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Case transferred electronically. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #7 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Change Venue to Southern District of California filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff National Funding Inc in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/17/2018, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc, identifying National Funding Inc., Ryan Hinton, Inc. dba Ryan Hinton, Robert Ryan Hinton, David Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2018-01026023 Receipt No: 0973-22857606 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Robert Ryan Hinton, Ryan Hinton Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Joseph G Dicks added to party Robert Ryan Hinton(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph G Dicks added to party Ryan Hinton Inc(pty:dft))(Dicks, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 12/17/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ryan Hinton Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant