This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2017 at 02:16:04 (UTC).

Natalie Huffman et al v. Midland Credit Managment, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 Natalie Huffman filed an Other lawsuit against Midland Credit Managment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael M. Anello and Andrew G. Schopler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01015

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Anello

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Toledo

Beverly Raposo

Natalie Huffman

Steve Huffman

Desiree Valdez

Jose Raposo

Mary Russell

Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud

Tamara Sams

Clinton Rusthoven

Inna Borboa Badran

Guadalupe Quevedo

Susan Joelson

Isaac Meyer

Diann Taylor

Xchel Osorio

Mitchell Joelson

Respondent

Midland Credit Managment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tammy Hussin

Attorney at Hussin Law

6404 Merlin Dr., Suite 100

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Respondent Attorneys

Thomas F Landers

Attorney at Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith, LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Leah Suzanne Strickland

Attorney at Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

18 #1

*Restricted*

#18

(#18) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-01534. Original file received electronically (Entered: 05/17/2017)

#17

(#17) Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-136) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2286, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, and with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Michael M. Anello. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/16/2017)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc., identifying Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Landers, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc..(Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Credit Managment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Landers, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/19/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 6/5/2017. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 03/15/2017)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mitchell Joelson, Mary Russell, Desiree Valdez, Natalie Huffman, Clinton Rusthoven, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Steve Huffman, David Toledo, Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Diann Taylor, Inna Borboa Badran, Susan Joelson, Tamara Sams. upon Midland Credit Managment, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas F. Landers. (Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 03/08/2017)

#12

(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/28/2017)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jloz) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

9 #1

Exhibit attachment to summons

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #4 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiffs Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Inna Borboa Badran, Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Mary Russell, Clinton Rusthoven, Tamara Sams, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Desiree Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment to summons)(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

#5

(#5) Initial CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Inna Borboa Badran, Tamara Sams, Guadalupe Quevedo, Mary Russell, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Isaac Myers, Jose Raposo, Beverly Raposo, Xchel Osorio, Desire Valdez, and Clinton Rusthoven; Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

4 #1

Exhibit attachment to summons

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #3 filed by Plaintiffs Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Inna Borboa Badran, Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Mary Russell, Clinton Rusthoven, Tamara Sams, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Desiree Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment to summons)(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19417685 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Mitchell Joelson, Mary Russell, Desiree Valdez, Natalie Huffman, Clinton Rusthoven, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Steve Huffman, David Toledo, Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Diann Taylor, Inna Borboa Badran, Susan Joelson, Tamara Sams. (Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Inna Borboa Badran(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Natalie Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Steve Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Mitchell Joelson(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Susan Joelson(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Isaac Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Xchel Osorio(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Guadalupe Quevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Beverly Raposo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Jose Raposo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Mary Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Clinton Rusthoven(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Tamara Sams(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Diann Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party David Toledo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Desiree Valdez(pty:pla))(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2017
  • (#19) Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (dlg) (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-01534. Original file received electronically (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-136) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2286, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of California for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, and with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Michael M. Anello. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc., identifying Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Landers, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc..(Attorney Thomas F Landers, Jr added to party Midland Credit Managment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Landers, Thomas) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/19/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 6/5/2017. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 03/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mitchell Joelson, Mary Russell, Desiree Valdez, Natalie Huffman, Clinton Rusthoven, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Steve Huffman, David Toledo, Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Diann Taylor, Inna Borboa Badran, Susan Joelson, Tamara Sams. upon Midland Credit Managment, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/8/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas F. Landers. (Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 03/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Midland Credit Managment, Inc. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • (#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on February 28, 2017. (Refer to Court's Standing Order and Local Rule 5-4.5) Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. Both the Court and counsel bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in Federal Court. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jloz) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #4 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiffs Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Inna Borboa Badran, Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Mary Russell, Clinton Rusthoven, Tamara Sams, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Desiree Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment to summons)(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Inna Borboa Badran, Tamara Sams, Guadalupe Quevedo, Mary Russell, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Isaac Myers, Jose Raposo, Beverly Raposo, Xchel Osorio, Desire Valdez, and Clinton Rusthoven; Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #3 filed by Plaintiffs Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Inna Borboa Badran, Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Mary Russell, Clinton Rusthoven, Tamara Sams, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Desiree Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment to summons)(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Inna Borboa Badran, Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Mary Russell, Clinton Rusthoven, Tamara Sams, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Desiree Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachment to summons)(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Inna Borboa Badran, Natalie Huffman, Steve Huffman, Mitchell Joelson, Susan Joelson, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Mary Russell, Clinton Rusthoven, Tamara Sams, Diann Taylor, David Toledo, Desiree Valdez. (Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19417685 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Mitchell Joelson, Mary Russell, Desiree Valdez, Natalie Huffman, Clinton Rusthoven, Isaac Meyer, Xchel Osorio, Guadalupe Quevedo, Steve Huffman, David Toledo, Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud, Beverly Raposo, Jose Raposo, Diann Taylor, Inna Borboa Badran, Susan Joelson, Tamara Sams. (Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Genevive Lorenzo Agsalud(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Inna Borboa Badran(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Natalie Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Steve Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Mitchell Joelson(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Susan Joelson(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Isaac Meyer(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Xchel Osorio(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Guadalupe Quevedo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Beverly Raposo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Jose Raposo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Mary Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Clinton Rusthoven(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Tamara Sams(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Diann Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party David Toledo(pty:pla), Attorney Tammy Gruder Hussin added to party Desiree Valdez(pty:pla))(Hussin, Tammy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/17/2017.] (Entered: 02/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less