This case was last updated from PACER on 09/23/2018 at 07:01:28 (UTC).

Narang v. Gerber Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 Narang filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Gerber Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04500

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richa Narang

Defendants

Gerber Life Insurance Company

Realty World Santa Clara Valley

Bhupesh Patel

Shivaun E. Patel

Robert Zuvela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey Wm. Steele

Attorney at Gizzi Reep Foley

1011 Madison Street, Sute 200

Benicia, CA 94510

Defendant Attorneys

Anna M. Martin

Attorney at Meserve Mumper & Hughes LLP

800 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2611

Grant Edward Ingram

Attorney at Meserve Mumper & Hughes LLP

800 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2611

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEVER AND REMAND NON-ERISA CAUSES OF ACTION filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/8/2018. Replies due by 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Santa Clara County State Court Action), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Martin, Anna) (Filed on 7/25/2018) Modified on 7/26/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2018)

2 #1

Exhibit (Santa Clara County State Court Action)

2 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #5

Exhibit C (Policy PAI-2034) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram

1 #4

Exhibit B (Policy ADD-2036) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 115CV282628. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12541893). Filed byGerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Santa Clara County State Court Action) to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration Declaration of Grant E. Ingram ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A (A (Santa Clara County State Court Action) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram, #4 Exhibit B (Policy ADD-2036) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram, #5 Exhibit C (Policy PAI-2034) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Anna) (Filed on 7/25/2018) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit A (A (Santa Clara County State Court Action) to Declaration of Grant E.

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #2

Declaration Declaration of Grant E. Ingram ISO Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A (Santa Clara County State Court Action) to Notice of Removal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEVER AND REMAND NON-ERISA CAUSES OF ACTION filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/8/2018. Replies due by 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Santa Clara County State Court Action), #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Martin, Anna) (Filed on 7/25/2018) Modified on 7/26/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 115CV282628. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12541893). Filed byGerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Santa Clara County State Court Action) to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration Declaration of Grant E. Ingram ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A (A (Santa Clara County State Court Action) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram, #4 Exhibit B (Policy ADD-2036) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram, #5 Exhibit C (Policy PAI-2034) to Declaration of Grant E. Ingram, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Anna) (Filed on 7/25/2018) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.