This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 09:52:43 (UTC).

Nalco Company v. Wisconsin Public Service Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 Nalco Company filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nalco Company

Defendants

Wisconsin Public Service Corporation

Wisconsin Public Service Corporation doing business as Weston Power Plant Unit 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Bryan Farney

Attorney at Dechert LLP

300 West 6Th Street Suite 1850

Austin, TX 78701

Sarah Anne Zylstra

Attorney at Boardman & Clark LLP

1 South Pinckney Street, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 927

Madison, WI 53701-0927

Cassandra Klingman

Attorney at Farney Daniels P.C.

800 South Austin Avenue, Ste. 200

Georgetown, TX 78626

William Bryan Farney

Attorney at Farney Daniels P.C.

800 South Austin Avenue, Ste. 200

Georgetown, TX 78626

Defendant Attorneys

Emery K. Harlan

Attorney at Gonzalez Saggio & Harlan LLP

111 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Carlos R. Pastrana

Attorney at MWH Law Group, LLP

111 E. Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

#10

(#10) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Pastrana, Carlos) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

1 #27

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action AO 120

1 #26

Summons Wisconsin Public Service Corporation

1 #25

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #24

Exhibit T - AJ Gallagher Presentation

1 #23

Exhibit S - S-Sorb Data Safety Sheet

1 #22

Exhibit R - MerSorb Data Safety Sheet

1 #21

Exhibit Q - Chem-Mod Web Pages

1 #19

Exhibit O - Chem-Mod Information Sheet

1 #18

Exhibit N - Declaration of John Meir

1 #17

Exhibit M - Declaration of Bruce A. Keister, Ph.D.

1 #16

Exhibit L - Article by Evan Granite

1 #15

Exhibit K - Steam Article

1 #14

Exhibit J - Academic Press Dictionary of Science and Technology

1 #13

Exhibit I - McGraw Hill Dictionary of Scientific Terms

1 #12

Exhibit H - US Patent No. 6,372,187

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,808,692

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wisconsin Public Service Corporation answer due 6/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/23/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Defendant Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Pastrana, Carlos) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Returned Executed. Wisconsin Public Service Corporation served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Cassandra Klingman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/23/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit William Bryan Farney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/23/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to Admit Cassandra Klingman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2231059.) by Plaintiff Nalco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Klingman, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to Admit William Bryan Farney Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2231052.) by Plaintiff Nalco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Farney, William) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Nalco Company. (Zylstra, Sarah) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Public Service Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2230680.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6,808,692 B2, issued 10/26/04, held by Hazelmere Research Ltd. (Nalco Company Exclusive Licensee); Patent # 6,808,692 C1, issued 04/07/17, held by Hazelmere Research Ltd. (Nalco Company Exclusive Licensee), filed by Nalco Company, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,808,692, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Andrew Fry, Ph.D., #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Klaus Oehr, #4 Exhibit D - US Patent No. 6,206,685, #5 Exhibit E - US Patent No. 6,471,506, #6 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 1), #7 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 2), #8 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 3), #9 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 4), #10 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 5), #11 Exhibit G - Article by Kevin Galbreath, #12 Exhibit H - US Patent No. 6,372,187, #13 Exhibit I - McGraw Hill Dictionary of Scientific Terms, #14 Exhibit J - Academic Press Dictionary of Science and Technology, #15 Exhibit K - Steam Article, #16 Exhibit L - Article by Evan Granite, #17 Exhibit M - Declaration of Bruce A. Keister, Ph.D., #18 Exhibit N - Declaration of John Meir, #19 Exhibit O - Chem-Mod Information Sheet, #20 Exhibit P - Chem-Mod Power Point Presentation, #21 Exhibit Q - Chem-Mod Web Pages, #22 Exhibit R - MerSorb Data Safety Sheet, #23 Exhibit S - S-Sorb Data Safety Sheet, #24 Exhibit T - AJ Gallagher Presentation, #25 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Summons - Wisconsin Public Service Corporation, #27 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 4/24/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less