This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 09:52:47 (UTC).

Nalco Company v. Wisconsin Power and Light Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 Nalco Company filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wisconsin Power and Light Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nalco Company

Defendants

Wisconsin Power and Light Company

Madison Gas and Electric Company

Wisconsin Public Service Corporation

Madison Gas and Electric Company doing business as Columbia Energy Center (Unit 1)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. Bryan Farney

Attorney at Dechert LLP

300 West 6Th Street Suite 1850

Austin, TX 78701

Sarah Anne Zylstra

Attorney at Boardman & Clark LLP

1 South Pinckney Street, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 927

Madison, WI 53701-0927

Cassandra Klingman

Attorney at Farney Daniels P.C.

800 South Austin Avenue, Ste. 200

Georgetown, TX 78626

William Bryan Farney

Attorney at Farney Daniels P.C.

800 South Austin Avenue, Ste. 200

Georgetown, TX 78626

Defendant Attorney

Michelle Marie Umberger

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

One East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703-5118

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Madison Gas and Electric Company, Wisconsin Power and Light Company, Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Umberger, Michelle) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Marie Umberger for Defendant Wisconsin Power and Light Company. (Umberger, Michelle) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

#11

(#11) Summons (Unissued) Returned Executed. Madison Gas and Electric Company served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) Modified on 5/17/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Returned Executed. Wisconsin Public Service Corporation served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons (Unissued) Returned Executed. Wisconsin Power and Light Company served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) Modified on 5/17/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

#6

(#6) Motion to Admit Cassandra Klingman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2231063.) by Plaintiff Nalco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Klingman, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#5

(#5) Motion to Admit William Bryan Farney Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2231056.) by Plaintiff Nalco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Farney, William) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

3 #2

Summons Issued as to Madison Gas and Electric Company

3 #1

Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Public Service Corporation

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Power and Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Public Service Corporation, #2 Summons Issued as to Madison Gas and Electric Company) (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Nalco Company. (Zylstra, Sarah) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 1)

1 #5

Exhibit E - US Patent No. 6,471,506

1 #4

Exhibit D - US Patent No. 6,206,685

1 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Klaus Oehr

1 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Andrew Fry, Ph.D.

1 #1

Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,808,692

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Madison Gas and Electric Company answer due 6/25/2018; Wisconsin Power and Light Company answer due 6/25/2018; Wisconsin Public Service Corporation answer due 6/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/23/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Madison Gas and Electric Company, Wisconsin Power and Light Company, Wisconsin Public Service Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Umberger, Michelle) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Marie Umberger for Defendant Wisconsin Power and Light Company. (Umberger, Michelle) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons (Unissued) Returned Executed. Madison Gas and Electric Company served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) Modified on 5/17/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Returned Executed. Wisconsin Public Service Corporation served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons (Unissued) Returned Executed. Wisconsin Power and Light Company served on 5/3/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. (Klingman, Cassandra) Modified on 5/17/2018. (lak) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Cassandra Klingman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/23/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit William Bryan Farney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/23/2018. (kwf) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to Admit Cassandra Klingman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2231063.) by Plaintiff Nalco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Klingman, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to Admit William Bryan Farney Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2231056.) by Plaintiff Nalco Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Farney, William) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Power and Light Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Public Service Corporation, #2 Summons Issued as to Madison Gas and Electric Company) (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. See related case 18-cv-279-jdp. (kwf) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Nalco Company. (Zylstra, Sarah) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2230660.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6,808,692, issued 10/26/04, held by Hazelmere Research Ltd. (Nalco Company Exclusive Licensee); Patent # 6,808,692 C1, issued 04/07/14, held by Hazelmere Research Ltd. (Nalco Company Exclusive Licensee), filed by Nalco Company, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,808,692, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Andrew Fry, Ph.D., #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Klaus Oehr, #4 Exhibit D - US Patent No. 6,206,685, #5 Exhibit E - US Patent No. 6,471,506, #6 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 1), #7 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 2), #8 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 3), #9 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 4), #10 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 6,808,692 File and Reexam History (Part 5), #11 Exhibit G - Article by Kevin Galbreath, #12 Exhibit H - US Patent No. 6,372,187, #13 Exhibit I - McGraw Hill Dictionary of Scientific Terms, #14 Exhibit J - Academic Press Dictionary of Science and Technology, #15 Exhibit K - Steam Article, #16 Exhibit L - Article by Evan Granite, #17 Exhibit M - Declaration of Bruce A. Keister, Ph.D., #18 Exhibit N - Declaration of John Meir, #19 Exhibit O - Chem-Mod Information Sheet, #20 Exhibit P - Chem-Mod Power Point Presentation, #21 Exhibit Q - Chem-Mod Web Pages, #22 Exhibit R - MerSorb Data Safety Sheet, #23 Exhibit S - S-Sorb Data Safety Sheet, #24 Exhibit T - AJ Gallagher Presentation, #25 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Summons - Madison Gas and Electric Company, #27 Summons - Wisconsin Public Service Corporation, #28 Summons - Wisconsin Power & Light Company, #29 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 4/24/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less