This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2018 at 07:29:32 (UTC).

Nabors v. Humphrey et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 Nabors filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Humphrey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00664

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter D Nabors, Jr

Little Rock, AR 72204

Defendants

Does Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility Jail Administration; Turn Key Health Personnel

S Humphrey

J Jones

Sanders

Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility

Turn Key Health

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility, Does, and Turn Key Health be dismissed from this action, for failure to state a claim. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/8/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued as to S Humphrey, J Jones, and Sanders. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants S. Humphrey, J. Jones, and Deputy Sanders; and directing the USMS to serve a copy of #12 the second Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/8/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Plaintiff shall have one final opportunity in which to submit an Amended Complaint in accordance with the directions set forth in this Order and in the #3 September 14, 2018 Order, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/25/2018. (lmc) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "SUMMARY of Allegations" pursuant to instruction from Chambers and the Pro Se Law Clerk. (jak) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EVIDENCE by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (cel) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMARY of Allegations by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (ljb)(Docket text modified on 10/4/2018 to correct the description of the document filed pursuant to instruction from Chambers)(jak) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (cel) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel, and denying #6 Motion for Order, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/25/2018. (lmc) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Order by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EVIDENCE and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (ljb) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/14/2018. (lmc) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until the total $350 has been paid. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a 1983 Complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Pulaski County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/14/2018. (jak) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants, filed by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (cel) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter D Nabors, Jr. (cel) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility is a litigant

Latest cases where SANDERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Turn Key Health Clinics LLC is a litigant