This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2023 at 00:01:21 (UTC).

Victoria Naborne v. Regis Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2018 Victoria Naborne filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Regis Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-05911

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victoria Naborne

Defendants

DOES 1-50

Regis Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mazyar Kaveh Shamshoni

Defendant Attorneys

Lara A. Grines

Lorraine H O'Hara

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #19 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

19 #1

Proposed Order Re Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action

#19

(#19) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action)(Levine, Lara) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#18

(#18) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#16

(#16) REPLY Reply in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Victoria Naborne. (Shamshoni, Mazyar) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

13 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

13 #2

Declaration Declaration of Mazyar K. Shamshoni

13 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Victoria Naborne. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mazyar K. Shamshoni, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shamshoni, Mazyar) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#9

(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibits to Notice of Removal

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #19 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action)(Levine, Lara) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference is vacated and off-calendar. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #13 is denied. The Court is satisfied that the amount in controversy requirement is met. Pretrial Conference is set for January 14, 2019 at 3:00 p.m., and Jury Trial is set for January 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/14/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) REPLY Reply in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Victoria Naborne. (Shamshoni, Mazyar) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lara Levine, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibits to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Levine, Lara) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: The hearing on the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 is continued from 9/10/2018 to 9/17/2018 at 01:30 PM. The Initial Status Conference currently set for 8/13/2018 is continued to 9/17/2018 at 1:30 PM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/01/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Victoria Naborne. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mazyar K. Shamshoni, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shamshoni, Mazyar) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE Notice of Initial Status Conference and Meeting Requirements filed by Plaintiff Victoria Naborne. (Shamshoni, Mazyar) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1446(D) filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (Levine, Lara) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/12/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketCONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Regis Corporation in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/2/2018, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Victoria Naborne in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/21/2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Regis Corporation, identifying 1. Victoria Naborne (Plaintiff) 2. Regis Corporation (Defendant). (O'Hara, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Lori Droud re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (O'Hara, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Lorraine H. O'Hara re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (O'Hara, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (O'Hara, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number BC694880 Receipt No: 0973-22047740 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Regis Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Lorraine H O'Hara added to party Regis Corporation(pty:dft))(O'Hara, Lorraine) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less