This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 20:53:38 (UTC).

MZ Wallace Inc. v. Sue Fuller et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 MZ Wallace Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Sue Fuller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02265

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MZ Wallace Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Black Diamond Group, Inc.

Susan Fuller

Sue Fuller

Sue Fuller doing business as The Oliver Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Marc Schuyler Reiner

Attorney at Hand Baldachin & Amburgey LLP

8 West 40Th St., 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Adam Benjamin Michaels

Attorney at Hand Baldachin & Associates LLP

8 West 40Th Street 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David H. Bernstein

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP (NYC)

919 Third Avenue, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Christopher Sean Ford

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP (NYC)

919 Third Avenue, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10022

Olena Vera Ripnick-O'Farrell

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP (NYC)

919 Third Avenue, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

30 #1

Stipulation and Order Regarding Confidentiality and Privilege

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

18 #6

Exhibit 6 - 2.26.18 Letter

18 #5

Exhibit 5 - Notice of Abandonment

18 #4

Exhibit 4 - 4.7.15 Office Action

18 #3

Exhibit 3 - Response to 9.19.14 Office Action

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Adam B. Michaels dated May 11, 2018 re: Stipulation and Order Regarding Confidentiality and Privilege. Document filed by MZ Wallace Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order Regarding Confidentiality and Privilege)(Michaels, Adam) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David H. Bernstein dated May 10, 2018 re: Oral Argument and Trial Scheduling. Document filed by Black Diamond Group, Inc., Sue Fuller.(Bernstein, David) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three and Four of Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by Black Diamond Group, Inc., Sue Fuller. (Bernstein, David) (Entered: 05/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth at the pretrial conference held pursuant to Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., on April 27, 2018, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case....All fact discovery must be completed by August 6, 2018.....All expert discovery must be completed by October 1, 2018. The Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by October 15, 2018.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/1/2018) (gr) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/27/2018. (gr) (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three and Four of Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by MZ Wallace Inc.. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER: On April 26, 2018, counterclaim defendant filed a motion to dismiss the counterclaim for tortious interference pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), Fed. R. Civ. P. Under Rule 15(a)(1)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P., a counterclaim plaintiff has 21 days after the service of a motion under Rule 12(b) to amend their pleading once as a matter of course. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that counterclaim plaintiff shall file any amended pleading by May 17, 2018. It is unlikely that counterclaim plaintiff will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended pleading is filed, counterclaim plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by May 17, 2018. Counterclaim defendants reply, if any, shall be served by May 31, 2018.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/27/2018) (gr) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim for Tortious Interference. . Document filed by MZ Wallace Inc.. (Michaels, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim for Tortious Interference. Document filed by MZ Wallace Inc..(Michaels, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall amend the docket of this case to change the name of party "Susan Fuller" to "Sue Fuller." (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/19/2018) (mro) (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Marc Schuyler Reiner to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Schuyler Reiner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:44. The following correction has been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1125. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Marc Schuyler Reiner. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Schuyler Reiner. The party information for the following parties has been modified: MZ Wallace Inc., Black Diamond Group, Inc., and Susan Fuller. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (pne) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MZ Wallace Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Black Diamond Group, Inc., Susan Fuller. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14812290)Document filed by MZ Wallace Inc..(Reiner, Marc) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACK DIAMOND GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Schuyler Reiner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Benjamin Michaels