This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 16:13:17 (UTC).

Myra Dickert et al v. Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Myra Dickert filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Sanyo Energy U S A Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-04664

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Myra Dickert

Howard Dickert

Defendants

Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation

Panasonic Corporation of North America

Sanyo North America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Birka-White

Attorney at Birka-White Law Offices

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Steven Todd Knuppel

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven T. Knuppel

178 E. Prospect Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

John D Green

Attorney at Farella Braun + Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Charles E. Schaffer

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Russell E Taylor

Attorney at Farella Braun Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 21St Fl., Russ Building

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

David Ramraj Singh

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway, 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

David L. Yohai

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal, & Manges, LLP`

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

John A Stratford

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

201 Redwood Shores Parkway

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#66

(#66) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#65

(#65) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Ramraj Singh Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John A. Stratford (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

63 #1

Exhibit A-C

#63

(#63) Declaration of David R. Singh in Support of #62 Supplemental Brief, filed byPanasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #62 ) (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#62

(#62) Supplemental Brief re #60 Brief Defendants' Opposition to Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice filed byPanasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#60

(#60) Brief Plainitffs' Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice filed byMyra Dickert. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

38 #1

Proposed Order

#38

(#65) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re #6 Summons Issued for Sanyo North America Corporation (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#8

(#8) *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re #6 Summons Issued for Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Myra Dickert.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#6

(#10) *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re #6 Summons Issued for Panasonic Corporation of North America (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Myra Dickert and Howard Dickert (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunction (Class Action) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12564201.). Filed byMyra Dickert, Howard Dickert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Ramraj Singh Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John A. Stratford (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Declaration of David R. Singh in Support of #62 Supplemental Brief, filed byPanasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #62 ) (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) Supplemental Brief re #60 Brief Defendants' Opposition to Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice filed byPanasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Declaration of David M. Birka-White in Support of #60 Brief filed byMyra Dickert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of David M. Birka-White in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of David M. Birka-White in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of David M. Birka-White in Support of Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Brief Plainitffs' Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction and Notice filed byMyra Dickert. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/31/2019) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #58 Stipulation Regarding Extending the Briefing Schedule on Jurisdictional Discovery. Plaintiffs' brief of no more than 5 pages due 5/31/2019; defendants' response due 6/21/2019.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed Order] Regarding Extending the Briefing Schedule on Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Myra Dickert. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/24/2019) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #55 Joint Stipulation Regarding Further Briefing on Jurisdictional Issues.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re #6 Summons Issued for Panasonic Corporation of North America (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re #6 Summons Issued for Sanyo North America Corporation (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re #6 Summons Issued for Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 9/6/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Myra Dickert.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Myra Dickert and Howard Dickert (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunction (Class Action) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12564201.). Filed byMyra Dickert, Howard Dickert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Panasonic Corporation of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D Green

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Birka-White