This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:34:25 (UTC).

Mulvey et al v. American Airlines et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Mulvey filed an Other lawsuit against American Airlines. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03038

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carolyn Mulvey

Aaron Mulvey

Dallas, TX 75232

Defendants

American Airlines Inc

Southwest Airlines Co

United Airlines Inc

Delta Airlines Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron Kyle Mulvey

Attorney at Law Offices of Aaron K Mulvey PLLC

1327 Bar Harbor Dr.

Dallas, TX 75232

Defendant Attorneys

Lars L Berg

Attorney at Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

201 Main Street, Suite 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102-3194

Michael S Mitchell

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

1401 New York Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 7): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2656, and that order has now been filed in the District of Columbia. (rekc) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion For Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/27/2018) (epm) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION For Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Delta Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#4

(#4) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by American Airlines Inc, Delta Airlines Co. (Berg, Lars) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to American Airlines Inc, Delta Airlines Co, Southwest Airlines Co, United Airlines Inc. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against American Airlines Inc, Delta Airlines Co, Southwest Airlines Co, United Airlines Inc filed by Aaron Mulvey, carolyn mulvey. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9585941) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mulvey, Aaron) Modified defendants on 11/15/2018 (mcrd/ala). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in District of Columbia as case number 1:18-cv-03119. (rekc) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Interdistrict Transfer to District of Columbia; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in District of Columbia. (rekc) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO - 7): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2656, and that order has now been filed in the District of Columbia. (rekc) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion For Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/27/2018) (epm) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION For Leave To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Delta Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by American Airlines Inc, Delta Airlines Co. (Berg, Lars) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to American Airlines Inc, Delta Airlines Co, Southwest Airlines Co, United Airlines Inc. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against American Airlines Inc, Delta Airlines Co, Southwest Airlines Co, United Airlines Inc filed by Aaron Mulvey, carolyn mulvey. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9585941) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mulvey, Aaron) Modified defendants on 11/15/2018 (mcrd/ala). (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant