Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2019 at 07:51:25 (UTC).

MULLINS v. GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 MULLINS filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03756

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AARON J. MULLINS

Defendant

GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan C. Volheim

Attorney at SULAIMAN LAW GROUP, LTD.

2500 S Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Eric D. Coleman

Attorney at SULAIMAN LAW GROUP LTD.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis

Attorney at SULAIMAN LAW GROUP LTD.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorney

Bonnie L. Martin

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Defendant General Revenue Corporation's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION.(Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/8/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L. Martin on behalf of Defendant GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service, filed by AARON J. MULLINS. GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION served on 12/6/2018. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Coleman, Eric) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (REO) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Coleman, Eric) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION, filed by AARON J. MULLINS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5176587) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Defendant General Revenue Corporation's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION.(Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/8/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L. Martin on behalf of Defendant GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (Martin, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of Service, filed by AARON J. MULLINS. GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION served on 12/6/2018. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Coleman, Eric) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION. (REO) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Coleman on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Coleman, Eric) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Plaintiff AARON J. MULLINS. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against GENERAL REVENUE CORPORATION, filed by AARON J. MULLINS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5176587) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Revenue Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonnie L. Martin