This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2018 at 16:06:13 (UTC).

Muhammad v. Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Muhammad filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Virginia M. Kendall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Muhammad

Chicgao, IL 60653

Defendants

Doe 1

Doe 4

Doe 3

Doe 2

Does 5-100

Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brian W. Norkett

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#10) MOTION by Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Chicago Patrolmen's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union. (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#3

(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ronald Muhammad (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. Prior to the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties are to exchange initial disclosures (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)). At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ks, ) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Muhammad as to Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (ew, ) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union by Brian W. Norkett (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

#10

(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Brian W. Norkett for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

#24

(#24) MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) Defendant's Motion to Stay Mandatory Initial Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A) (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

#26

(#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 5/10/2018. Defendant's Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline pending disposition of Motion to Dismiss #24 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 is reset for 6/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

24 #1

Exhibit EX. A

#25

(#25) Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Brian W. Norkett for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

#23

(#23) NOTICE by Ronald Muhammad of affidavit for reply motion to dismiss; Exhibit (ew, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#22

(#22) REPLY by Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union to Response #20 Defendant's Reply Brief to its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#20

(#20) AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Ronald Muhammad for response motion to dismiss; Exhibits (Received for docketing 4/11/2018) (ew, ) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

#21

(#21) Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition/Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union(Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 4/5/2018. Plaintiff's oral motion for extension of time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #13 is granted. Response shall be due by 4/9/2018. Reply due by 4/16/2018. Defendant shall answer by 4/12/2018. Plaintiff Muhammed provided information regarding the Hibbler Pro Se Helpdesk in open Court. Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (lk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 5/10/2018. Defendant's Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline pending disposition of Motion to Dismiss #24 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 is reset for 6/14/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Brian W. Norkett for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/10/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) Defendant's Motion to Stay Mandatory Initial Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A) (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE by Ronald Muhammad of affidavit for reply motion to dismiss; Exhibit (ew, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) REPLY by Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union to Response #20 Defendant's Reply Brief to its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition/Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union(Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Ronald Muhammad for response motion to dismiss; Exhibits (Received for docketing 4/11/2018) (ew, ) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 4/5/2018. Plaintiff's oral motion for extension of time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #13 is granted. Response shall be due by 4/9/2018. Reply due by 4/16/2018. Defendant shall answer by 4/12/2018. Plaintiff Muhammed provided information regarding the Hibbler Pro Se Helpdesk in open Court. Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (lk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AFFIDAVIT by Ronald Muhammad for response motion to dismiss; Exhibits (ew, ) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STATUS Report Defendant's Initial Status Report by Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Motion by Brian W. Norkett for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Chicago Patrolmen's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union by Brian W. Norkett (Norkett, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Muhammad as to Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union on 1/17/2018, answer due 2/7/2018. (ew, ) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes the MIDP Standing Order. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ks, ) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. Prior to the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties are to exchange initial disclosures (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)). At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ronald Muhammad (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chicago Patrolmen's Federal Credit Union. (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Muhammad; ("EXHIBIT"). (ks, ) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.