This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2018 at 05:30:03 (UTC).

Mueller v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 Mueller filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00822

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Mueller

Defendant

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Amy M. Samberg

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff, PC-Denver

1600 Broadway, Suite 2425

Denver, CO 80202

Jonathan Thomas Koehler

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi & Rudloff, PC-Denver

1600 Broadway, Suite 2425

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#8

(#8) STATE COURT ORDER: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by District Court, Denver County Judge Brian R Whitney on 04/04/2018. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Jury Demand upon Travelers Casualty Insurance Co of America on 03/14/2018, filed by Plaintiff John Mueller (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Jury Demand upon Travelers Casualty Insurance Co of America on 03/13/2018, filed by Plaintiff John Mueller (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, filed by John Mueller.(rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, filed by John Mueller.(rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

1 #12

Exhibit E - State Notice of Removal

1 #11

Exhibit D - Certificate of Good Standing

1 #10

Exhibit C - State Return of Service - Complaint

1 #9

Exhibit B - State Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit A8 - State Docket

1 #7

Exhibit A7 - State Order Granting Unopposed Motion

1 #6

Exhibit A6 - State Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond

1 #5

Exhibit A5 - State Entry of Appearance

1 #4

Exhibit A4 - State Return of Service - Amended Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit A3 - Delay Reduction Order

1 #1

Exhibit A1 - State Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • (#10) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATE COURT ORDER: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by District Court, Denver County Judge Brian R Whitney on 04/04/2018. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Jury Demand upon Travelers Casualty Insurance Co of America on 03/14/2018, filed by Plaintiff John Mueller (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Jury Demand upon Travelers Casualty Insurance Co of America on 03/13/2018, filed by Plaintiff John Mueller (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, filed by John Mueller.(rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, filed by John Mueller.(rroge, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2018CV30872. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6041341), filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - State Complaint, #2 Exhibit A2 - State Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A3 - Delay Reduction Order, #4 Exhibit A4 - State Return of Service - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit A5 - State Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit A6 - State Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #7 Exhibit A7 - State Order Granting Unopposed Motion, #8 Exhibit A8 - State Docket, #9 Exhibit B - State Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit C - State Return of Service - Complaint, #11 Exhibit D - Certificate of Good Standing, #12 Exhibit E - State Notice of Removal, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koehler, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less