This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:25:52 (UTC).

MTC Financial , Inc v. Rothbart et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 MTC Financial , Inc filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Rothbart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl W. Hoffman and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01637

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carl W. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTC Financial, Inc.

Defendants

Discover Bank

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

FIA Card Services, N.A.

Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.

United States of America

Andrew E. Rothbart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan F Smith

Attorney at Malcolm & Cisneros, A Law Corporation

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Christine A Roberts

3815 South Jones Blvd., Suite 5

Las Vegas, NV 89103

Nathan Smith

Attorney at Malcolm & Cisneros, A Law Corporation

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

Jory C. Garabedian

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE, LLP

520 South 4Th Street, Suite 360

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Laurel I. Handley

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

520 South 4Th Streeet, Suite 360

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Alexander E. Stevko

Attorney at Department of Justice- Tax Division

Po Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Garabedian, Jory) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Garabedian, Jory) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jory C. Garabedian on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Garabedian, Jory) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United States of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2018.(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-778902-C, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Garabedian, Jory) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Garabedian, Jory) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jory C. Garabedian on behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Garabedian, Jory) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United States of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2018.(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-778902-C, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.