This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 07:25:56 (UTC).

MTC Financial Inc v. Juarez et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 MTC Financial Inc filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Juarez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01638

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MTC Financial Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Andrea Juarez

Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.

United States of America

Defendants and Counter Defendants

Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc.

MTC Financial Inc

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Nathan F Smith

Attorney at Malcolm & Cisneros, A Law Corporation

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Christine A Roberts

3815 South Jones Blvd., Suite 5

Las Vegas, NV 89103

Nathan Smith

Attorney at Malcolm & Cisneros, A Law Corporation

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Russel Geist

10080 W. Alta Drive, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Alexander E. Stevko

Attorney at Department of Justice- Tax Division

Po Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Alexander E. Stevko

Attorney at Department of Justice- Tax Division

Po Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Christine A Roberts

3815 South Jones Blvd., Suite 5

Las Vegas, NV 89103

Nathan Smith

Attorney at Malcolm & Cisneros, A Law Corporation

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrea Juarez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Geist, Russel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#6

(#6) Defendant Andrea D. Juarez's ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, , COUNTERCLAIM against MTC Financial Inc, Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc., United States of America by Andrea Juarez. filed by Andrea Juarez.(Geist, Russel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal, #4 Statement in Removal Case, #2 Minute Order Removal Case, #3 Answer to Petition for Removal, by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#3

(#3) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United States of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2018.(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-778902-C3, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/29/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrea Juarez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Geist, Russel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant Andrea D. Juarez's ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, , COUNTERCLAIM against MTC Financial Inc, Republic Silver State Disposal, Inc., United States of America by Andrea Juarez. filed by Andrea Juarez.(Geist, Russel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal, #4 Statement in Removal Case, #2 Minute Order Removal Case, #3 Answer to Petition for Removal, by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by United States of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/20/2018.(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-18-778902-C3, by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stevko, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.