This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2019 at 20:49:53 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Mallinckrodt Ard Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Mallinckrodt Ard Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Robert Blakey, John Z. Lee and Lisa A. Jensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00379

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judges

John Robert Blakey

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC

MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC

MSP RECOVERY, LLC

MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC

MAO-MSO RECOVERY II, LLC, Series PMPI

Defendants

Mallinckrodt Ard Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

United Biosource Corporation

Curascript, Inc.

Express Scripts Holding Company

Express Scripts, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Lin Baum

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman PC

12100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90025-7106

Adam Michael Foster

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman, P.c.

10940 Wilshire Blvd, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Robert Brent Wisner

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman

12100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Pedram Esfandiary

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman, P.c.

10940 Wilshire Blvd, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Michael L. Baum

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei, et al.

10940 Wilshire Blvd, 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

R. Brent Wisner

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman, P.c.

10940 Wilshire Blvd., 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Bijan Esfandiari

Attorney at Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman, P.c.

12100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Herbert R Giorgio, Jr

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

211 North Broadway Suite 3600

St Louis, MO 63102-2750

Philip Bartz

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

1155 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Sarah Burwick

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

120 Broadway Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386

Christopher L Dueringer

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

120 Broadway Suite 300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386

George P Watson

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Scott Collins Sullivan

Attorney at WilliamsMcCarthy LLP

120 West State St., P.O. Box 219

Rockford, IL 61105-0219

George Patrick Watson

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

14Th Floor, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Matthew M. Martino

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 1003

Jason D Russell

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3144

Evan R Kreiner

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Michael H Menitove

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

Four Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Evan Ross Kreiner

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

4 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Eric J. Gorman

Attorney at KPMG LLP

200 East Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#2) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint)(Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

2 #1

Exhibit A- Complaint

#2

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

#195

(#195) STATUS Report (Joint) by Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., United Biosource Corporation (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#194

(#194) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#193

(#193) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Based upon a review of the issues raised in the motions to dismiss #187 #190 , the Court modifies the page limits and sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs are directed to file a combined response to the motions by 6/25/19, limited to 30 pages; Defendants' replies shall be due by 7/23/19, limited to 20 pages. The presentment date before Magistrate Judge Jensen is stricken. No appearance is required on the motions.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#187

(#187) MOTION by Defendants Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Ard Inc. to dismiss First Amended Complaint (Sullivan, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#190

(#190) MOTION by Defendants Curascript, Inc., United Biosource Corporation, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. to dismiss (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#192

(#192) NOTICE of Motion by Matthew M. Martino for presentment of motion to dismiss #190 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#191

(#191) MEMORANDUM by Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., United Biosource Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #190 (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#189

(#189) NOTICE of Motion by Scott Collins Sullivan for presentment of motion to dismiss #187 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Sullivan, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

188 #20

Exhibit 20

301 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#195) STATUS Report (Joint) by Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., United Biosource Corporation (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#193) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Based upon a review of the issues raised in the motions to dismiss #187 #190 , the Court modifies the page limits and sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiffs are directed to file a combined response to the motions by 6/25/19, limited to 30 pages; Defendants' replies shall be due by 7/23/19, limited to 20 pages. The presentment date before Magistrate Judge Jensen is stricken. No appearance is required on the motions.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#192) NOTICE of Motion by Matthew M. Martino for presentment of motion to dismiss #190 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#191) MEMORANDUM by Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., United Biosource Corporation in support of motion to dismiss #190 (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#190) MOTION by Defendants Curascript, Inc., United Biosource Corporation, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. to dismiss (Martino, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#189) NOTICE of Motion by Scott Collins Sullivan for presentment of motion to dismiss #187 before Honorable Lisa A. Jensen on 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Sullivan, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#188) MEMORANDUM by Mallinckrodt Ard Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC in support of motion to dismiss #187 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Sullivan, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#187) MOTION by Defendants Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Ard Inc. to dismiss First Amended Complaint (Sullivan, Scott) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#186) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Curascript, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc. by Evan Ross Kreiner (Kreiner, Evan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORRECTED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 10/30/2017, receipt number 0973-20746055), filed by Plaintiffs MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC.(Wisner, Robert) Modified on 11/1/2017 (shb). [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata, #2 filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint)(Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20746055 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC. (Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party MSP Recovery, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Robert Brent Wisner added to party MSPA Claims 1, LLC(pty:pla))(Wisner, Robert) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.