This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2018 at 07:34:50 (UTC).

Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc. v. Williams et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Mrs United States National Pageant, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David G. Larimer and Marian W. Payson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06587

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David G. Larimer

Referral Judge

Marian W. Payson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Stephanie L Williams

Crown Garland LLC

Cosmos International Pageants, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Stacey E. Trien

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Paul L. Leclair

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Robert P. Yawman, III

Attorney at Leclair Korona Cole LLP

28 E. Main Street, Suite 1500

Rochester, NY 14614

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Laura A. Myers

Attorney at The Wolford Law Firm LLP

600 Reynolds Arcade Building, 16 East Main Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Michael R. Wolford

Attorney at The Wolford Law Firm LLP

16 East Main Street, 600 Reynolds Arcade Building

Rochester, NY 14614

Victoria Schmidt Gleason

Attorney at The Wolford Law Firm LLP

16 East Main Street, 600 Reynolds Arcade Building

Rochester, NY 14614

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

17 #1

Certificate of Service

#17

8 #3

Certificate of Service

8 #2

Appendix Proposed Order

8 #1

Declaration of Paul L. Leclair

#8

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

#2

1 #4

Summons to Cosmos International

1 #3

Summons to Crown Garland

1 #2

Summons to Williams

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc..(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. David G. Larimer: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2018 re #8 MOTION to Expedite Hearing of Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc., #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc. The Court reserves decision on the motions. (Court Reporter DM.) (PR) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) LETTER ORDER granting request for a brief adjournment within which to file the PDP and attend the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/9/2018. Within one week of the Court's ruling on the pending motion for preliminary injunction, the parties will submit proposed dates to the court for the submission of the PDP and the rescheduling of the Rule 16 scheduling conference. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/3/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Plan by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc..(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Reply Attorney Declaration of Paul L. Leclair filed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 09/19/18 P. Berry Letter, #2 Exhibit B - 09/19/18 Austin Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 09/19/18 Chisholm Letter, #4 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of T. Ilacqua, #5 Exhibit A - email with Wolford Letter, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/20/2018. (KAH) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 9/19/18. (PR) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cosmos International Pageants, Inc., Crown Garland LLC, Stephanie L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A to Sharon McInnis Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A to Teri Brown-Walker Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit E to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit F to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit G to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit H to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit I to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit J to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit K to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #21 Exhibit Exhibit L to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #22 Exhibit Exhibit M to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #23 Exhibit Exhibit N to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #24 Exhibit Exhibit O to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #25 Exhibit Exhibit P to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #27 Exhibit Exhibit R to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #28 Exhibit Exhibit S to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #29 Exhibit Exhibit T to Stephanie Williams Declaration, #30 List of witnesses and exhibits, #31 Certificate of Service)(Wolford, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc. by Cosmos International Pageants, Inc., Crown Garland LLC, Stephanie L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wolford, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Schmidt Gleason on behalf of All Defendants (Gleason, Victoria) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul L. Leclair, #2 Declaration of Anthony Ilacqua, #3 Declaration of Emily Simmons, #4 Declaration of Katy Moody Cusick, #5 Declaration of Shena Dixon Mason, #6 Declaration of Molly Lewellen, #7 Declaration of Amy Demanchick, #8 Exhibit A - Crown Garland Virginia Filings, #9 Exhibit B - Cosmos Virginia Filings, #10 Exhibit C - Trademarks, #11 Exhibit D - 2016 Licensing Agreement, #12 Exhibit E - 2017 Licensing Agreement, #13 Exhibit F - Termination Letter, #14 Exhibit G - Cease and Desist Letter (6/28/18), #15 Exhibit H - Email Mrs. USNP to State Directors (7/7/18), #16 Exhibit I - Sollers/Mrs.DC Facebook Messages (8/7/18), #17 Exhibit J - Email Re: Website Return (11/6/17), #18 Exhibit K - Document Management Portal List, #19 Exhibit L - Email to ND Titleholders(3/27/18), #20 Exhibit M - Titleholder Agreement, #21 Exhibit N - 2018 National Pageant Agenda Cover, #22 Exhibit O - Crown Garland Facebook Post Re: YouTube (6/25/16), #23 Exhibit P - Williams Facebook Post Re: Disparaging Plaintiff (6/25/16), #24 Exhibit Q - Williams Facebook Post Re: Disparaging Plaintiff (6/26/16), #25 Exhibit R - Ad Program Excerpts, #26 Exhibit S - Pageantry Magazine, #27 Exhibit T - Cusick 2018 State Director Agreement, #28 Exhibit U - Kentucky Cosmos Facebook Page (8/24/18), #29 Exhibit V - Email From Williams to State Directors (7/4/18), #30 Exhibit W - Email From Williams to State Directors (7/8/18), #31 Exhibit X - Mason 2018 State Director Contract, #32 Exhibit Y - Emails From Williams Re: VA Facebook (7/14/18), #33 Exhibit Z - TN Facebook Pages, #34 Exhibit AA - KY Facebook Video, #35 Exhibit BB - Mrs USNP Websites, #36 Exhibit CC - Cosmos Websites, #37 Exhibit DD - Miss Arnold Press Release, #38 Exhibit EE - Twitter/Instagram Pages, #39 Exhibit FF - Additional Facebook Pages, #40 Exhibit GG - Google Searches, #41 Appendix List of Witnesses and Exhibits, #42 Memorandum in Support, #43 Certificate of Service)(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.. Cosmos International Pageants, Inc. served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.. Crown Garland LLC served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.. Stephanie L Williams served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Cosmos International Pageants, Inc., Crown Garland LLC, Stephanie L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (BK) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Hon. David G. Larimer added. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey E. Trien on behalf of Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc. (Trien, Stacey) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cosmos International Pageants, Inc., Crown Garland LLC, Stephanie L Williams $ 400 receipt number 0209-3188388, filed by Mrs. United States National Pageant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Williams, #3 Summons to Crown Garland, #4 Summons to Cosmos International)(Leclair, Paul) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey E. Trien

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul L. Leclair