This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2018 at 07:04:49 (UTC).

Moxie Pest Control LP v. Prowess Pest Control LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 Moxie Pest Control LP filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Prowess Pest Control LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John H England, III and Virginia Emerson Hopkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John H England, III

Virginia Emerson Hopkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moxie Pest Control LP

Defendants

Prowess Pest Control LLC

Joseph Toone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Myers Ruzic

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 5Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Michael S Denniston

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Benn Charles Wilson

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Brock Murphy

Attorney at BROCK G MURPHY LAW FIRM LLC

One Chase Corporate Drive Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35244

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: All Discovery due by December 7, 2018. All potentially Dispositive Motions due by January 7, 2019. See all other deadlines and instructions as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/19/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#17

(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

#16

(#16) March 2018 Attorney Time Record by Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone. filed by Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone (Murphy, Brock) Modified on 4/13/2018 (JLC). (Entered: 04/13/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

#14

(#14) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/10/2018. (KWC) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Virginia Emerson Hopkins. The telephone conference set for April 16, 2018 is CANCELLED. Please use case number 2:18-cv-293-VEH on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Benn Charles Wilson on behalf of Moxie Pest Control LP (Wilson, Benn) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits 1 & 2; Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement of Moxie Pest Control, LP; and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on Joseph Toone on 2/28/2018, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/20/2018. (KEK) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than May 2, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after May 2, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on April 16, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/20/2018. (KEK) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

8 #1

Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Murphy, Brock) (Entered: 03/18/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits 1 & 2; Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement of Moxie Pest Control, LP; and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on Joseph Toone as Registered Agent for Prowess Pest Control LLC on 2/28/2018, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moxie Pest Control LP. Joseph Toone served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moxie Pest Control LP. Prowess Pest Control LLC served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KEK) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: All Discovery due by December 7, 2018. All potentially Dispositive Motions due by January 7, 2019. See all other deadlines and instructions as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/19/2018. (JLC) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) March 2018 Attorney Time Record by Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone. filed by Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone (Murphy, Brock) Modified on 4/13/2018 (JLC). (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/10/2018. (KWC) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Virginia Emerson Hopkins. The telephone conference set for April 16, 2018 is CANCELLED. Please use case number 2:18-cv-293-VEH on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Benn Charles Wilson on behalf of Moxie Pest Control LP (Wilson, Benn) (Entered: 03/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits 1 & 2; Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement of Moxie Pest Control, LP; and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on Joseph Toone on 2/28/2018, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/20/2018. (KEK) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than May 2, 2018. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after May 2, 2018. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:15 a.m. on April 16, 2018. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/20/2018. (KEK) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Murphy, Brock) (Entered: 03/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Exhibits 1 & 2; Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement of Moxie Pest Control, LP; and Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge served on Joseph Toone as Registered Agent for Prowess Pest Control LLC on 2/28/2018, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moxie Pest Control LP. Joseph Toone served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moxie Pest Control LP. Prowess Pest Control LLC served on 2/28/2018, answer due 3/21/2018. (Denniston, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3034650 (ALND B4601087025) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(KEK). (Denniston, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2018 (KEK). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Moxie Pest Control LP. (KEK) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Prowess Pest Control LLC, Joseph Toone, filed by Moxie Pest Control LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KEK) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less