This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:34:09 (UTC).

Mosquera v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Mosquera filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02997

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Mosquera

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven E. Hovsepian

Attorney at Barbas, Nunez, Sanders, Butler & Hovsepian

1802 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33606-1852

Defendant Attorney

Brooke Chastain Juan

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, PA

1410 N Westshore Blvd Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33607-4533

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Notice of designation of track by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sandra Mosquera. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/13/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (DG) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14917578) filed by Sandra Mosquera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Notice of designation of track by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Juan, Brooke) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responsive pleading due on or before February 1, 2019, as February 2, 2019, the requested deadline, occurs on a Saturday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/7/2019. (JMF) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Juan, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sandra Mosquera. Related case(s): no (Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/13/2018. (GSO) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (DG) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:18-cv-2997-T-23AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14917578) filed by Sandra Mosquera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Hovsepian, Steven) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven E. Hovsepian