This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:16:37 (UTC).

Morrison v. Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 Morrison filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and Emily C. Marks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00904

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Morrison

Defendants

Crowne Investments, Inc.

Crowne Operations, Inc.

Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC

Crowne Management Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Hartmann Rand

Attorney at Zarzaur Mujumdar & Debrosse

2332 2Nd Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Breanna Harris Young

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie

P O Box 598512

Birmingham, AL 35259-8512

Arnold William Umbach, III

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

P O Box 598512

Birmingham, AL 35259-8512

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

11 #1

Corrected Signature Pages

#11

10 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

4 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Receipt

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Young, Breanna) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, ) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/17/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC.(Young, Breanna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1) Plaintiff's #11 motion to withdraw her motion for entry of default is GRANTED; 2) Defendants' #8 motion for an extension of time to file an answer is GRANTED; counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before December 19, 2018, as further set out in order; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/12/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Young, Breanna) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Crowne Operations, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Young, Breanna) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Crowne Investments, Inc. re #10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Young, Breanna) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Carol Morrison. (Rand, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #1 Corrected Signature Pages) (wcl, ). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #8 MOTION - Attorney Arnold William Umbach, III for Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., and Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, UNOPPOSED by Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC. (Young, Breanna) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #15 ORDER) MOTION for Entry of Default by Carol Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Affidavit of Paul H. Rand)(Rand, Paul) Modified on 12/12/2018 (wcl, ). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Lori Chandler for: Crowne Investments, Inc. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; Crowne Operations, Inc. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Carol Morrison re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Rand, Paul) Modified on 10/26/2018 to add the link to the #4 notice (wcl, ). (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Carol Morrison; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(wcl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Carol Morrison. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carol Morrison. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Crowne Investments, Inc., Crowne Operations, Inc., Parkwood Health Care Facility, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051114.), filed by Carol Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt) (wcl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Hartmann Rand(Designation Retained)