This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2018 at 06:16:50 (UTC).

Morris v. Allen Lund Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 Morris filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allen Lund Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

LiKisha Morris

Defendants

DANIEL SANTIAGO SERNA

STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

COMMONWEALTH DAIRY, LLC

ALDI, INC.

JACOB SALAZAR

Allen Lund Company, LLC

ALLEN LUND COMPANY, INC.

EC TRUCKING ENTERPRISES, INC.

Counter Claimant and Defendant

STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

Interested Party

NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY OF THE SOUTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

James M. Roth

Attorney at The Roth Firm

950 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 1650

Atlanta, GA 30326

Joshua M Leizerman

Attorney at Leizerman & Associates

3450 W. Central Avenue, Suite 328

Toledo, OH 43606

Michael Jay Leizerman

Attorney at Leizerman & Associates

3450 West Central Avenue, Suite 328

Toledo, OH 43606

Rena Mara Leizerman

Attorney at Leizerman & Associates

3450 West Central Avenue, Suite 328

Toledo, OH 43606

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey William Johnson

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

1900 Nw Corporate Blvd., Suite 450 West

Boca Raton, FL 33431

BRUCE MICHAEL TRYBUS

Attorney at Cooney Trybus Kwavnick Peets

1600 W Commercial Boulevard, Suite 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

James Kendall Clark

Attorney at Clark Robb Mason Coulombe & Buschman

19 W Flagler Street, 14Th Floor, Biscayne Building

Miami, FL 33130

LUIS MENENDEZ-APONTE

Attorney at Luks, Santaniello, Petrillo, and Jones, LLC

150 West Flagler Street, Suite 2750

Miami, FL 33130

STEPHEN JOHN RILEY

Attorney at Stephen J. Riley, P.A.

2631 E. Oakland Park Blvd, Suite 201

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306

BRIAN STEPHEN KEIF

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HUGH BEHAN

4000 Hollywood Boulevard, Suite 430

Hollywood, FL 33021

Steven Roger Adamsky

Attorney at Mitrani Rynor Adamsky & Toland, P.A.

1200 Weston Road, Penthouse

Weston, FL 33326

RODNEY E. PETTEY

Attorney at YATES MCLAMB & WEYHER

Pob 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

SEAN TIMOTHY PARTRICK

Attorney at YATES, MCLAMB & WEYHER, LLP

Pob 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-22389. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Case transferred to District of Middle District of North Carolina electronically (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) ORDER granting #84 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/12/18. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #106 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by LiKisha Morris. Responses due by 4/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #106 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Allen Lund Company, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Consent Motion to Amend Order)(Adamsky, Steven) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer to 3rd Amended Complaint by Allen Lund Company, Inc., Allen Lund Company, LLC. Responses due by 3/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 ALC's Am. Ans to 3rd Am. Complaint- Exhibit A)(Adamsky, Steven) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 03/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) ORDER granting #128 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) James M. Roth, Esq.. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/21/18. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Roth. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10423099 by LiKisha Morris. Responses due by 3/6/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Jacob Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riley, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Jacob Salazar. (Riley, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by LiKisha Morris. Commonwealth Dairy, LLC served on 7/3/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by LiKisha Morris. ALDI, Inc. served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by LiKisha Morris. State Farm Insurance Company served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Michael Jay Leizerman ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Rena Mara Leizerman. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/30/2017. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/30/2017. (dq) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rena Mara Leizerman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9847718 by LiKisha Morris. Responses due by 7/11/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Jay Leizerman. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-9847704 by LiKisha Morris. Responses due by 7/11/2017 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to ALDI, Inc., Allen Lund Company, Inc., Commonwealth Dairy, LLC, EC Trucking Enterprises, Inc., Jacob Salazar, Daniel Santiago Serna, State Farm Insurance Company. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (rms1) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9845663, filed by LiKisha Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Allen Lund Company, Inc., #3 Summon(s) EC Trucking Enterprises, Inc., #4 Summon(s) Daniel Santiago Serna, #5 Summon(s) Jacob Salazar, #6 Summon(s) Commonwealth Dairy, LLC, #7 Summon(s) ALDI, Inc., #8 Summon(s) State Farm Insurance Company)(Leizerman, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/12/2018.] (Entered: 06/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E C Trucking Enterprises Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLEN LUND CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where National Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC is a litigant