This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2018 at 07:42:03 (UTC).

Morganherring v. Chapman

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 Morganherring filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Chapman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CT-03218

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Morgan-Herring

Raleigh, NC 27606

William Morganherring

Raleigh, NC 27606

Defendant

Mr. Chapman

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Envelope

10 #1

Document in Support

#10

(#10) Document: "Document #7 Evidence of Plaintiff" filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

9 #2

Envelope

9 #1

Document in Support

#9

(#9) Document: "Enclosed Evidence Document #6 in Number" filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) Document: "Attached Evidentiary Documents (5) Five in Number?" filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Letter from William Morgan-Herring correcting and an error (adding the date) on page 10 of the complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/21/2018. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/17/2018. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#2

(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to William Morgan-Herring at Central Prison. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mr. Chapman filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Document: "Document #7 Evidence of Plaintiff" filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Document: "Enclosed Evidence Document #6 in Number" filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachments: #1 Document in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Document: "Attached Evidentiary Documents (5) Five in Number?" filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from William Morgan-Herring correcting and an error (adding the date) on page 10 of the complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Case Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III for complaint review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/21/2018. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/17/2018. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to William Morgan-Herring at Central Prison. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mr. Chapman filed by William Morgan-Herring. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mr. Chapman is a litigant