This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 01:50:29 (UTC).

Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art et al.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 Morgan Art Foundation Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Analisa Torres and Barbara C. Moses. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04438

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

Referral Judge

Barbara C. Moses

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Morgan Art Foundation Limited

Figure 5 Art LLC

Morgan Consolidated Ltd.

Emeline Salama-Caro

Marc Salama-Caro

Shearbrook LLC

Simon Salama-Caro

Ri Catalogue Raisonne LLC

Jamie Thomas

Robert Indiana

Michael McKenzie doing business as American Image Art

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

James W Brannan

Michael McKenzie doing business as American Image Art

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant

Michael McKenzie doing business as American Image Art

Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Jamie Thomas

James W Brannan

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Maaren Alia Shah

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Luke William Nikas

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Ryan Adam Rakower

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Paul W. Ryan

Attorney at Serpe Ryan LLC

1115 Broadway, 12Thfloor

New York, NY 10022

Silvia L. Serpe

Attorney at Serpe LLC

16 Madison Square West, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Emily Seiderman West

Attorney at Venable LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

John J. E. Markham, II

Attorney at Markham Read Zerner LLC

One Commercial Wharf West

Boston, MA 02110

Bridget A. Zerner

Attorney at Markham Read Zerner LLC

One Commercial Wharf West

Boston, MA 02110

Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Paul W. Ryan

Attorney at Serpe Ryan LLC

1115 Broadway, 12Thfloor

New York, NY 10022

Silvia L. Serpe

Attorney at Serpe LLC

16 Madison Square West, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

Edward Patrick Boyle

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Kan Min Nawaday

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Jessie F. Beeber

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

John Carlos Vazquez

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Emily Seiderman West

Attorney at Venable LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

481 #1

Exhibit B

481 #481

Main Document

479 #9

Exhibit I

479 #8

Exhibit H

479 #7

Exhibit G

479 #5

Exhibit E

479 #4

Exhibit D

479 #3

Exhibit C

479 #2

Exhibit B

479 #1

Exhibit A

479 #479

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

1,077 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#481) NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit B to Declaration of Bridget A. Zerner (ECF 479) re: #479 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by American Image Art, Michael McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B).(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#480) DECLARATION of John J.E. Markham, II in Opposition re: #465 MOTION for Sanctions .. Document filed by American Image Art, Michael McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#479) DECLARATION of Bridget A. Zerner in Opposition re: #465 MOTION for Sanctions .. Document filed by American Image Art, Michael McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I).(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#478) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #465 MOTION for Sanctions . . Document filed by American Image Art, Michael McKenzie..(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#477) STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS THEREFORE STIPULATED AND AGREED that the present expert discovery and summary judgment deadlines be modified and extended as follows: The deadline for the disclosure of affirmative experts and the exchange of affirmative expert reports is extended to April 5, 2022; The deadline for the disclosure of any rebuttal experts and the exchange of rebuttal reports is extended to April 26, 2022; The deadline to file pre-motion letters regarding summary judgment, which shall conform to the individual practices of Judge Torres, is extended to June 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Deposition due by 5/17/2022., Expert Discovery due by 5/17/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 1/11/22) (yv) Modified on 1/11/2022 (yv). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#476) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Bridget Zerner and Luke Nikas dated January 10, 2022 re: Gonzalez Deposition Pursuant to Order at ECF 474. Document filed by American Image Art, Michael McKenzie..(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#475) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John J.E. Markham, II and Luke Nikas dated 1/4/2022 re: Joint Status Letter re Order at ECF 464. Document filed by American Image Art, Michael McKenzie..(Markham, John) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#474) The Court has received and reviewed the parties Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Dkt. No. 473.) The parties are directed to report to the Court no later than January 10, 2022, whether the Gonzalez deposition has been completed. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses) (Text Only Order) (ma) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#473) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited..(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#472) ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record during the telephonic status conference held today, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: Defendant McKenzie shall file his papers in opposition to plaintiff MAF's motion for sanctions (Dkt. No. 465) no later than January 17, 2022. MAF shall file its reply papers no later than January 27, 2022. The hearing on the sanctions motion will take place on March 1, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. No later than February 3, 2022, the parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court as to whether either or both parties wish to present live testimony at the hearing and, if so, shall identify (i) each proposed live witness, (ii) the topic(s) on which that witness is expected to testify, and (iii) the estimated time required for examination. Exhibits B and C to the second Zerner declaration (Dkt. Nos. 461-2, 461-3) will be unsealed. The second Zerner declaration, including Exhibit A thereto (Dkt. Nos. 461, 461-1)will remain under seal but will be accessible to counsel for both plaintiff and defendant and further set forth in this Order. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to ( Responses due by 1/17/2022, Replies due by 1/27/2022., Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 12/21/2021) (rro) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
518 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Indiana, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited. (Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jamie Thomas, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited. (Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Image Art, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited. (Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael McKenzie, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited. (Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Image Art, Robert Indiana, Michael McKenzie, Jamie Thomas. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15088427)Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget A. Zerner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J.E. Markham II