This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 01:49:30 (UTC).

Morgan Art Foundation Limited et al v. Brannan

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 Morgan Art Foundation Limited filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Brannan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Analisa Torres and Barbara C. Moses. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08231

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

Referral Judge

Barbara C. Moses

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Morgan Art Foundation Limited

Shearbrook (US), LLC

Simon Salama-Caro

RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC

Figure 5 Art LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

James W. Brannan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Luke William Nikas

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Maaren Alia Shah

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Ryan Adam Rakower

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Dennis H. Tracey, III

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP (NYC)

875 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Edward Patrick Boyle

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Kan Min Nawaday

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, SDNY

One Saint Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Jessie F. Beeber

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

John Carlos Vazquez

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#175

(#175) AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). ECF Nos. 213 and 258 in 18cv4438 (ECF No.86 in related case 18cv8231). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/23/21) (yv) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#174

(#174) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l )(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, and RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, and Defendants Jamie Thomas and James W. Brannan as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Indiana stipulate as follows: 1. The action captioned Morgan Art Foundation Limited et al. v. Brannan, No. 18 cv- 08231 (the "Estate Action") shall be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. 2. All claims brought by Plaintiff Morgan Art Foundation Limited against Defendants Jamie Thomas, individually and in all other capacities, and James W. Brannan as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Indiana in the action captioned Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie et al., No. 18-cv-04438 shall be dismissed, with prejudice. 3. All claims brought by Counterclaim-Plaintiff James W. Brannan as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Indiana against Counterclaim-Defendants Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, and RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC in the action captioned Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie et al., No. 18-cv-04438 shall be dismissed, with prejudice. 4. The parties agree to bear their own costs in connection with the claims dismissed under this stipulation. 5. For the avoidance of doubt, this stipulation of dismissal does not dismiss any claims between Morgan Art Foundation Limited and Michael McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art in Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie et al., No. 18-cv-04438. No claims asserted by Morgan Art Foundation Limited against Michael McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art, and no claims asserted by Michael McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art shall be affected by this stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/15/2021) (kv) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#173

(#173) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) James W. Brannan pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Shearbrook (US), LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#172

(#172) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) James W. Brannan pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Shearbrook (US), LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Nikas, Luke) Modified on 6/11/2021 (km). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#171

(#171) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that in accordance with Plaintiffs' March 9, 2021 letter, the above-captioned action shall be STAYED through and including May 17, 2021. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/15/2021) (cf) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

170 #1

Text of Proposed Order

170 #170

Main Document

#169

(#169) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (168 in 1:18-cv-08231-AT-BCM) Letter, filed by Simon Salama-Caro, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Shearbrook (US), LLC, (384 in 1:18-cv-04438-AT-BCM) Letter, filed by Simon Salama-Caro, Ri Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Shearbrook LLC. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that all parties in both cases consent to the requested stay, the parties are directed to submit a fully-executed stipulation and proposed order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/9/2021) (cf) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#168

(#168) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Luke Nikas dated March 8, 2021 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC..(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

1 #19

Exhibit S

1 #18

Exhibit R

1 #17

Exhibit Q

1 #16

Exhibit P

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

311 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#175) AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). ECF Nos. 213 and 258 in 18cv4438 (ECF No.86 in related case 18cv8231). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/23/21) (yv) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#174) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l )(A)(ii), Plaintiffs Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, and RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, and Defendants Jamie Thomas and James W. Brannan as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Indiana stipulate as follows: 1. The action captioned Morgan Art Foundation Limited et al. v. Brannan, No. 18 cv- 08231 (the "Estate Action") shall be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice. 2. All claims brought by Plaintiff Morgan Art Foundation Limited against Defendants Jamie Thomas, individually and in all other capacities, and James W. Brannan as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Indiana in the action captioned Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie et al., No. 18-cv-04438 shall be dismissed, with prejudice. 3. All claims brought by Counterclaim-Plaintiff James W. Brannan as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Indiana against Counterclaim-Defendants Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, and RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC in the action captioned Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie et al., No. 18-cv-04438 shall be dismissed, with prejudice. 4. The parties agree to bear their own costs in connection with the claims dismissed under this stipulation. 5. For the avoidance of doubt, this stipulation of dismissal does not dismiss any claims between Morgan Art Foundation Limited and Michael McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art in Morgan Art Foundation Limited v. McKenzie et al., No. 18-cv-04438. No claims asserted by Morgan Art Foundation Limited against Michael McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art, and no claims asserted by Michael McKenzie d/b/a American Image Art shall be affected by this stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/15/2021) (kv) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #173 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Analisa Torres for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (dt) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) James W. Brannan pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Shearbrook (US), LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Luke Nikas. RE-FILE Document No. #172 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (handwritten signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#172) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) James W. Brannan pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Shearbrook (US), LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Nikas, Luke) Modified on 6/11/2021 (km). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that in accordance with Plaintiffs' March 9, 2021 letter, the above-captioned action shall be STAYED through and including May 17, 2021. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/15/2021) (cf) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#170) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by James W. Brannan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#169) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (168 in 1:18-cv-08231-AT-BCM) Letter, filed by Simon Salama-Caro, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Shearbrook (US), LLC, (384 in 1:18-cv-04438-AT-BCM) Letter, filed by Simon Salama-Caro, Ri Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Shearbrook LLC. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that all parties in both cases consent to the requested stay, the parties are directed to submit a fully-executed stipulation and proposed order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 3/9/2021) (cf) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#168) LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Luke Nikas dated March 8, 2021 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC..(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Luke William Nikas. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $76000000; Fee Date 9/10/2018;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $76000; the Fee Date has been modified to 9/11/2018;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maaren Alia Shah on behalf of Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC. (Shah, Maaren) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James W. Brannan As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Robert Indiana, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC. (Nikas, Luke) Modified on 9/11/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Figure 5 Art LLC.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shearbrook (US), LLC.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-4438. Document filed by Figure 5 Art LLC, Morgan Art Foundation Limited, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, Shearbrook (US), LLC.(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against James W. Brannan. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15551593)Document filed by Morgan Art Foundation Limited, Figure 5 Art LLC, Shearbrook (US), LLC, Simon Salama-Caro, RI Catalogue Raisonne LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Nikas, Luke) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kan Min Nawaday

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessie F Beeber(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis H. Tracey, III