This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2019 at 07:14:08 (UTC).

Barbara Moreno v. Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Barbara Moreno filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-02473

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Moreno

Defendants

Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC

Does 1-25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan M Ferrell

Attorney at Apex Trial Law

4100 Newport Place Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Thomas Wolfe Kohler

Attorney at Apex Trial Law

4100 Newport Place Drive Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel E K Lowe

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Angela M Spivey

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Andrew G Phillips

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street Suite 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #3

Proposed Order

12 #2

Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia

12 #1

List of Courts to which Admitted and in Good Standing

#12

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Certificates of Good Standing - Georgia and Mississippi

#11

#10

9 #5

Proposed Order

9 #4

Request for Judicial Notice

9 #3

Exhibit A through F In Support of Decl of R. Lowe

9 #2

Declaration of Rachel E. K. Lowe In Support Of

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Declaration of Rachel E. K. Lowe

#8

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) VACATING JANUARY 28, 2019 HEARING by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Accordingly, in light of the parties' stipulation, the Court VACATES the January 28, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall include a proposed date for the hearing in their January 29, 2019 status report as indicated in the stipulation, (Doc. No. 8), and the Courts prior order, (Doc. No. 10). (bm) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew G. Phillips APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC, designating Rachel E.K. Lowe as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Angela M. Spivey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC, designating Rachel E.K. Lowe as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew G. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22912137) filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 List of Courts to which Admitted and in Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Andrew G Phillips added to party Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC(pty:dft)) (Phillips, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angela M. Spivey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22904182) filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing - Georgia and Mississippi, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Angela M Spivey added to party Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC(pty:dft)) (Spivey, Angela) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION STAYING ACTION AND DEFENDANT PINNACLE FOODS GROUP, LLC'S DEADLINE TORESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Stay Case #8 : Having considered the parties Joint Stipulation and good cause appearing therefor, the Court GRANTS the Joint Stipulation. This action is hereby stayed until January 29, 2019. All deadlines, including the deadline of defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC to respond to the operative complaint, are stayed. If this action is not otherwise dismissed before that date, the parties are directed to submit a status report to the Court by January 29, 2019 that includes a deadline for defendant's anticipated responsive pleading and, if necessary, a briefing schedule for a motion to dismiss. (bm) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rachel E. K. Lowe In Support Of, #3 Exhibit A through F In Support of Decl of R. Lowe, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Lowe, Rachel) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Product Analysis following Corporate Acquisition for 60 days filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel E. K. Lowe, #2 Proposed Order)(Lowe, Rachel) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:18-cv-2473 VAP (SPx). (ghap) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-25, Inclusive, Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC., filed by plaintiff Barbara Moreno. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/19/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 11/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lowe, Rachel) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC, identifying Pinnacle Foods, Inc., Conagra Brands Inc.. (Lowe, Rachel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. (Lowe, Rachel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1827269 Receipt No: 0973-22789424 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Declaration of Caroline Wright in Support of Defendant Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Rachel E K Lowe added to party Pinnacle Foods Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Lowe, Rachel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle Foods is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel E K Lowe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Margarite Spivey